EP2208480 - Expandable support device and method of use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.02.2013 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2013 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stout Medical Group LP 410 East Walnut Street, Suite 8 Perkasie, PA 18944 / US | [2010/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Greenhalgh, E. Skott 820 Penllyn Pike Lower Gwynedd, PA 19002 / US | 02 /
Romano, John-Paul 59 Skyline Drive Chalfont, PA 18914 / US | [2010/29] | Representative(s) | Thoma, Michael, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/29] | Thoma, Michael, et al Lorenz - Seidler - Gossel Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10000274.0 | 13.01.2010 | [2010/29] | Priority number, date | US20090205081P | 14.01.2009 Original published format: US 205081 P | [2010/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2208480 | Date: | 21.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2208480 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | [2010/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/30, A61F2/44 | [2010/29] | CPC: |
A61F2/44 (EP,US);
A61F2/4465 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30331 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30367 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30372 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30373 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30405 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30433 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30495 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30507 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3055 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30593 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30594 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30601 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0025 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verlängerbare Stützvorrichtung und Verwendungsverfahren | [2010/29] | English: | Expandable support device and method of use | [2010/29] | French: | Dispositif de support extensible et procédé d'utilisation | [2010/29] | Examination procedure | 20.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/40] | 11.02.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/12] | Divisional application(s) | EP10006544.0 / EP2228041 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0245625 (STRYKER SPINE SA [FR], et al) [A] 1-9 * page 6, line 4 - page 15; figure -; claim - *; | [A]US2007255409 (DICKSON ANDREW M [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0095] - [0113]; figures 5,7,21,22,23,26; claim - *; | [A]US2007255421 (DICKSON ANDREW M [US]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0020] - [0032]; figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP1080703 (HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP [US]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0021] - [0033]; figures 1-2a,14; claim - *; | [A]JPS62164458 (YUSEFU HATSUSAN DAHERU) [A] 1-9 * figure - *; | [A]WO2005055887 (DELTACOR GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-9 * figure -; claim - * | by applicant | WO03082363 | - WALTON ET AL., "Inhibition of Prostoglandin E2 Synthesis in Abdominal Aortic Aneurysms", CIRCULATION, (19990706), pages 48 - 54 | - TAMBIAH ET AL., "Provocation of Experimental Aortic Inflammation Mediators and Chlamydia Pneumoniae", BRIT. J SURGERY, vol. 88, no. 7, pages 935 - 940 | - FRANKLIN ET AL., "Uptake of Tetracycline by Aortic Aneurysm Wall and Its Effect on Inflammation and Proteolysi", BRIT. J SURGERY, vol. 86, no. 6, pages 771 - 775 | - "Sp Increases Expression of Cyclooxygenase-2 in Hypoxic Vascular Endothelium", J BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 275, no. 32, pages 24583 - 24589 | - PYO ET AL., "Targeted Gene Disruption of Matrix Metalloproteinase-9 (Gelatinase B) Suppresses Development of Experimental Abdominal Aortic Aneurysms", J CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, vol. 105, no. 11, pages 1641 - 1649 |