EP2218851 - Door lever mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEBHARDT Transport- und Lagersysteme GmbH Frühlingstrasse 2-3 93413 Cham / DE | [2010/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lesch, Franz Weinbergstraße 18 93413 Cham / DE | [2010/33] | Representative(s) | Mischung, Ralf Eder Schieschke & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Elisabethstraße 34/II 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/32] | Mischung, Ralf Eder & Schieschke Patentanwälte Elisabethstraße 34/II 80796 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/33] | Mischung, Ralf Eder & Schieschke Patentanwälte Elisabethstraße 34/II D-80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10000367.2 | 15.01.2010 | [2010/33] | Priority number, date | DE20092001785U | 12.02.2009 Original published format: DE 202009001785 U | [2010/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2218851 | Date: | 18.08.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2218851 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2218851 | Date: | 06.08.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | E05B13/00, E05B83/10 | [2014/29] | CPC: |
E05B13/002 (EP);
E05B83/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2014/04] | E05B65/12, E05B13/00 | ||
Former IPC [2010/33] | E05B13/00, E05B65/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/33] | Title | German: | Türhebelmechanismus | [2010/33] | English: | Door lever mechanism | [2010/33] | French: | Mécanisme de levier de porte | [2010/33] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/06] | 16.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.01.2010 | CY | 06.08.2014 | CZ | 06.08.2014 | DK | 06.08.2014 | EE | 06.08.2014 | FI | 06.08.2014 | HR | 06.08.2014 | LT | 06.08.2014 | LV | 06.08.2014 | MC | 06.08.2014 | MK | 06.08.2014 | MT | 06.08.2014 | NL | 06.08.2014 | RO | 06.08.2014 | SE | 06.08.2014 | SI | 06.08.2014 | SK | 06.08.2014 | SM | 06.08.2014 | TR | 06.08.2014 | BG | 06.11.2014 | NO | 06.11.2014 | GR | 07.11.2014 | IS | 06.12.2014 | PT | 09.12.2014 | AT | 15.01.2015 | IE | 15.01.2015 | LU | 15.01.2015 | BE | 31.01.2015 | CH | 31.01.2015 | LI | 31.01.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 15.01.2010 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
MT | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
SM | 06.08.2014 | ||
TR | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
AT | 15.01.2015 | ||
IE | 15.01.2015 | ||
LU | 15.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CY | 06.08.2014 | |
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
MT | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
AT | 15.01.2015 | ||
IE | 15.01.2015 | ||
LU | 15.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/25] | CY | 06.08.2014 | |
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
AT | 15.01.2015 | ||
IE | 15.01.2015 | ||
LU | 15.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CY | 06.08.2014 | |
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
IE | 15.01.2015 | ||
LU | 15.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CY | 06.08.2014 | |
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
LU | 15.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | CY | 06.08.2014 | |
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
LU | 15.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/43] | CY | 06.08.2014 | |
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
LU | 15.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | CY | 06.08.2014 | |
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
LU | 15.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 06.08.2014 | |
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 06.08.2014 | |
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 06.08.2014 | |
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 06.08.2014 | |
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 06.08.2014 | |
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 06.08.2014 | |
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 06.08.2014 | |
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 06.08.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE9017294U (F. HERSTERBERG & SÖHNE GMBH & CO. KG) [A] 1-13 * page 4, paragraph 3 - page 5, paragraph 2; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2005247086 (NIXON WILLIE E JR [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0408169 (FRUEHAUF JAPAN [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |