Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
28.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] |
27.07.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] |
08.06.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 11.07.2012 [2012/28] |
18.05.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 20.06.2012 [2012/25] |
04.05.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] |
21.10.2011 | (Expected) grant | published on 23.11.2011 [2011/47] |
23.09.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
29.08.2011 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
29.08.2011 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
05.07.2011 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
01.04.2011 | Change - classification | published on 04.05.2011 [2011/18] |
26.11.2010 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
12.10.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
23.07.2010 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
23.07.2010 | First examination report | |
19.03.2010 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] |
19.03.2010 | Request for examination filed | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] |
18.02.2010 | Change: Renewal fee paid | |
18.02.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid |