EP2278619 - Solar cell module and method for manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.03.2013 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.05.2013 [2013/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | For all designated states SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD. 428-5, Gongse-dong, Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2012/39] |
Former [2011/35] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-city, Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | ||
For all designated states SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD. 428-5, Gongse-dong, Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
Former [2011/04] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-city, Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kang, Ku-Hyun 109-2204 Dongsuwon LG Village 1-cha Apt., Mangpo-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2011/04] | Representative(s) | Taor, Simon Edward William, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/42] | Taor, Simon Edward William, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2011/04] | Weitzel, Wolfgang Patentanwalt Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 10000502.4 | 20.01.2010 | [2011/04] | Priority number, date | KR20090066071 | 20.07.2009 Original published format: KR 20090066071 | [2011/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2278619 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/04] | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/142, H01L31/18 | [2011/04] | CPC: |
H01L31/0468 (EP,KR,US);
H01L31/0352 (KR);
H01L31/022425 (KR);
H01L31/046 (EP,KR,US);
Y02E10/50 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Solarzellenmodul und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [2011/04] | English: | Solar cell module and method for manufacturing the same | [2011/04] | French: | Module de cellule solaire et son procédé de fabrication | [2011/04] | Examination procedure | 21.03.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |