EP2210766 - Seat control device, seat control method, and seat control program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AISIN AW CO., LTD. 10, Takane, Fujii-cho Anjo-shi Aichi-ken 444-1192 / JP | For all designated states AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken 448-8650 / JP | [2010/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyajima, Takayuki c/o Aisin AW Co., Ltd. 10, Takane Fujii-cho Anjo-shi, Aichi-ken, 444-1192 / JP | 02 /
Hirota, Koichi c/o Aisin Seiki Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken, 448-8650 / JP | [2012/32] |
Former [2012/21] | 01 /
Miyajima, Takayuki Aisin AW CO., LTD. 10, Takane Fujii-cho Anjo-shi Aichi-ken, 444-1192 / JP | ||
02 /
Hirota, Koichi Aisin Seiki Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi Aichi-ken, 448-8650 / JP | |||
Former [2010/30] | 01 /
Miyajima, Takayuki Aisin AW Co., Ltd. 10, Takane Fujii-cho Anjo-shi Aichi-ken, 444-1192 / JP | ||
02 /
Hirota, Koichi Aisin Seiki Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi Aichi-ken, 448-8650 / JP | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/34] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/30] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10000539.6 | 20.01.2010 | [2010/30] | Priority number, date | JP20090015684 | 27.01.2009 Original published format: JP 2009015684 | [2010/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2210766 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2210766 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | [2010/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2210766 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/02, B60N2/44 | [2010/30] | CPC: |
B60N2/026 (EP,US);
B60N2/99 (US);
B60N2/0244 (US);
B60N2/0278 (EP);
B60N2/986 (EP,US);
B60N2220/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/30] | Title | German: | Sitzsteuerungsvorrichtung, Sitzsteuerungsverfahren und Sitzsteuerungsprogramm | [2010/30] | English: | Seat control device, seat control method, and seat control program | [2010/30] | French: | Dispositif de commande de siège, procédé de commande de siège et programme de commande de siège | [2010/30] | Examination procedure | 22.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/18] | 03.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 23.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.01.2010 | AT | 22.08.2012 | BE | 22.08.2012 | CY | 22.08.2012 | CZ | 22.08.2012 | DK | 22.08.2012 | EE | 22.08.2012 | FI | 22.08.2012 | HR | 22.08.2012 | IT | 22.08.2012 | LT | 22.08.2012 | LV | 22.08.2012 | MK | 22.08.2012 | MT | 22.08.2012 | NL | 22.08.2012 | PL | 22.08.2012 | RO | 22.08.2012 | SE | 22.08.2012 | SI | 22.08.2012 | SK | 22.08.2012 | SM | 22.08.2012 | TR | 22.08.2012 | BG | 22.11.2012 | NO | 22.11.2012 | GR | 23.11.2012 | ES | 03.12.2012 | IS | 22.12.2012 | PT | 24.12.2012 | IE | 20.01.2013 | LU | 20.01.2013 | MC | 31.01.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
MK | 22.08.2012 | ||
MT | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
SM | 22.08.2012 | ||
TR | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
IE | 20.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
MT | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
SM | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
IE | 20.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
MT | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
IE | 20.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
IE | 20.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 22.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2008109140 (HOZUMI SOICHIRO [JP], et al) [AD] 1,7,8 * the whole document *; | [A]US2008133092 (HOZUMI SOICHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1,7,8* figures 4,5 * | by applicant | JP2008114751 |