EP2221590 - Racking facility and transport device of the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/34] | Racking facility and transport device of same | ||
[2010/35] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.11.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STOPA Anlagenbau GmbH Industriestrasse 12 77855 Achern-Gamshurst / DE | [2012/04] |
Former [2010/34] | For all designated states STOPA Anlagenbau GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse 12 77855 Achern-Gamshurst / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stotz, Heiko Im Biefang 26 79618 Rheinfelden / DE | 02 /
Herrmann, Stefan Franz-Volk-Strasse 40 77652 Offenburg / DE | [2010/34] | Representative(s) | Lenz, Steffen, et al LICHTI - Patentanwälte Postfach 41 07 60 76207 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/34] | Lenz, Steffen, et al LICHTI Patentanwälte Postfach 410760 76207 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 10000664.2 | 22.01.2010 | [2010/34] | Priority number, date | DE20091007438 | 04.02.2009 Original published format: DE102009007438 | [2010/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2221590 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2221590 | Date: | 18.12.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01G19/04, G01G19/42, B65G1/04 | [2013/51] | CPC: |
G01G19/042 (EP);
B65G1/0492 (EP);
G01G19/42 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/34] | G01G19/04, B65G1/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Regallager und Transporteinrichtung eines solchen Regallagers | [2010/34] | English: | Racking facility and transport device of the same | [2010/35] | French: | Palier d'étagère et dispositif de transport d'un tel palier d'étagère | [2010/34] |
Former [2010/34] | Racking facility and transport device of same | Examination procedure | 25.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/50] | 06.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]DE9301506U (MAIER, LUDWIG; MALEK ALFONS) [I] 1-14 * page 2, line 15 - page 3, line 10 * * page 7, line 32 - page 10, line 35 * * figures 1-8d *; | [A]US4363369 (SUSOR WILLIAM C) [A] 1-14 * figures 1-4 * * column 1, line 9 - line 35 * * column 3, line 32 - column 7, line 2 *; | [A]JPS59150314 (SANDEN CORP) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * figures 1-4 *; | [AD]DE29722170U (WILLACH GMBH GEB [DE]) [AD] 1-14 * page 4, line 4 - page 5, line 6 * * page 9, line 26 - page 11, line 8 * * page 16, line 29 - page 18, line 18 * * figures 1-7, 11 * | by applicant | EP1614834 | DE202007003447U | DE29722170U |