EP2175487 - Semiconductor device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/15] | Semiconductor device and method for fabricating the same | ||
[2014/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.2016 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Socionext Inc. 2-10-23 Shin-Yokohama, Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 222-0033 / JP | [2015/24] |
Former [2015/14] | For all designated states Fujitsu Semiconductor Limited 2-10-23 Shin-yokohama Kohoku-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 222-0033 / JP | ||
Former [2010/15] | For all designated states Fujitsu Microelectronics Limited 7-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0722 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Watanabe, Kenichi c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2015/11] |
Former [2010/15] | 01 /
Watanabe, Kenichi c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2015/11] |
Former [2010/15] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10000804.4 | 24.07.2003 | [2010/15] | Priority number, date | JP20020223343 | 31.07.2002 Original published format: JP 2002223343 | [2010/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2175487 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2175487 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2175487 | Date: | 11.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/11] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2175487 | Date: | 06.05.2015 | [2015/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/522, H01L23/532, H01L23/528 | [2014/47] | CPC: |
H01L23/522 (EP,US);
H01L27/04 (KR);
H01L21/76877 (US);
H01L21/76804 (US);
H01L21/76843 (US);
H01L23/481 (US);
H01L23/485 (US);
H01L23/5226 (EP,US);
H01L23/528 (US);
H01L23/5283 (US);
H01L23/53204 (US);
H01L23/53223 (US);
H01L23/53228 (US);
H01L23/53266 (US);
H01L23/5329 (EP,US);
H01L23/562 (US);
H01L23/58 (US);
H01L23/585 (EP,US);
H01L29/0607 (US);
H01L29/0611 (US);
H01L29/0619 (US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/15] | H01L23/522, H01L23/532 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2010/15] | Title | German: | Halbleitervorrichtung | [2014/47] | English: | Semiconductor device | [2014/47] | French: | Dispositif à semi-conducteur | [2014/47] |
Former [2010/15] | Halbleitervorrichtung und Herstellungsverfahren | ||
Former [2010/15] | Semiconductor device and method for fabricating the same | ||
Former [2010/15] | Dispositif à semi-conducteur et son procédé de fabrication | Examination procedure | 26.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2012 | Examination requested [2012/46] | 23.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03016553.4 / EP1387404 | Divisional application(s) | EP15150440.4 / EP2863430 | EP15150443.8 / EP2863431 | EP17156454.5 / EP3208846 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030016553) is 22.02.2008 | Opposition(s) | 14.12.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 06.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0389548 (FUJITSU LTD, et al); | [A]JPH05175198 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO); | [A]JPH1154705 (NEC CORP); | [A]JP2000124403 (NEC CORP); | by applicant | JP2000124403 |