Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2214177 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2214177



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






All documents(20)
Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 96
05.07.2013 Confirmation of withdrawal of application/closure of proceedings Search / examination 1
19.03.2013 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of examination fee/designation fee/non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 2
06.03.2013 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
13.08.2012 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
10.07.2012 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
10.07.2012 European search opinion Search / examination 4
10.07.2012 European search report Search / examination 2
04.07.2012 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
07.07.2010 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
06.05.2010 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
14.04.2010 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
06.04.2010 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
03.02.2010 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
28.01.2010 Abstract Search / examination 1
28.01.2010 Claims Search / examination 3
28.01.2010 Description Search / examination 23
28.01.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
28.01.2010 Drawings Search / examination 9
28.01.2010 Priority document Search / examination 30
28.01.2010 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 8