EP2216485 - Cord tensioning device and curtain assembly with same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blöcker Zweigniederlassung der Hunter Douglas Holding GmbH & Co. KG Postfach 150413 28094 Bremen / DE | [2014/44] |
Former [2010/32] | For all designated states Blöcker Zweigniederlassung der Hunter Douglas Holding GmbH Postfach 15 04 13 28094 Bremen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Glöckner, Ulrich c/o Blöcker Zweigniederlassung der Hunter Douglas Holding GmbH & Co. KG Norderneystrasse 3 28217 Bremen / DE | [2014/35] |
Former [2010/32] | 01 /
Glöckner, Ulrich c/o Blöcker Zweigniederlassung der Hunter Douglas Holding GmbH & Co. KG Norderneystrasse 3 28217 Bremen / DE | Representative(s) | Philipp, Matthias Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/35] | Philipp, Matthias Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/32] | Philipp, Matthias Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10000975.2 | 01.02.2010 | [2010/32] | Priority number, date | DE20091008461 | 09.02.2009 Original published format: DE102009008461 | [2010/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2216485 | Date: | 11.08.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2216485 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2216485 | Date: | 27.08.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/35] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2216485 | Date: | 19.11.2014 | [2014/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/262, E06B9/322, E06B9/327 | [2014/17] | CPC: |
E06B9/327 (EP);
E06B9/262 (EP);
E06B2009/2625 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/32] | E06B9/322 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/32] | Title | German: | Schnurspannvorrichtung und damit ausgerüstete Vorhanganlage | [2010/32] | English: | Cord tensioning device and curtain assembly with same | [2010/32] | French: | Dispositif de serrage de ficelle et installation de rideau ainsi pourvue | [2010/32] | Examination procedure | 18.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/14] | 11.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.04.2014 | Opposition(s) | 28.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.02.2010 | CY | 27.08.2014 | CZ | 27.08.2014 | DK | 27.08.2014 | EE | 27.08.2014 | ES | 27.08.2014 | FI | 27.08.2014 | HR | 27.08.2014 | IT | 27.08.2014 | LT | 27.08.2014 | LV | 27.08.2014 | MC | 27.08.2014 | MK | 27.08.2014 | MT | 27.08.2014 | NL | 27.08.2014 | RO | 27.08.2014 | SE | 27.08.2014 | SI | 27.08.2014 | SK | 27.08.2014 | SM | 27.08.2014 | TR | 27.08.2014 | BG | 27.11.2014 | NO | 27.11.2014 | GR | 28.11.2014 | IS | 27.12.2014 | PT | 29.12.2014 | GB | 01.02.2015 | IE | 01.02.2015 | LU | 01.02.2015 | BE | 28.02.2015 | CH | 28.02.2015 | LI | 28.02.2015 | FR | 02.03.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 01.02.2010 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
MT | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SI | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
SM | 27.08.2014 | ||
TR | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
GB | 01.02.2015 | ||
IE | 01.02.2015 | ||
LU | 01.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
FR | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CY | 27.08.2014 | |
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
MT | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SI | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
GB | 01.02.2015 | ||
IE | 01.02.2015 | ||
LU | 01.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
FR | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 27.08.2014 | |
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SI | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
GB | 01.02.2015 | ||
IE | 01.02.2015 | ||
LU | 01.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
FR | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CY | 27.08.2014 | |
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SI | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
GB | 01.02.2015 | ||
IE | 01.02.2015 | ||
LU | 01.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CY | 27.08.2014 | |
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SI | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
LU | 01.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | CY | 27.08.2014 | |
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
LU | 01.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CY | 27.08.2014 | |
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
LU | 01.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/44] | CY | 27.08.2014 | |
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
LU | 01.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 27.08.2014 | |
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 27.08.2014 | |
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 27.08.2014 | |
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/16] | CY | 27.08.2014 | |
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 27.08.2014 | |
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 27.08.2014 | |
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 27.08.2014 | |
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 27.08.2014 | |
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 27.08.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5553653 (ROZON DAVID [CA]) [X] 1,3 * column 3 - column 4; figures 1-7 * [I] 2-4,8-13; | [XI]US5168913 (HAINES RICHARD K [US]) [X] 1,3,5-7,14 * column 9, line 54 - column 10, line 12 * [I] 2,4,8-13,15 | by applicant | EP1447516 |