EP2213794 - Method for producing a water drainage device beside the track of a rail section [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.04.2015 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.05.2015 [2015/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zürcher, Ralf Binzenweg 12 77974 Meissenheim / DE | [2010/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/31] | Representative(s) | Goy, Wolfgang PATENTANWALT Zähringer Strasse 373 79108 Freiburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/31] | Goy, Wolfgang Zähringer Strasse 373 79108 Freiburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 10001020.6 | 02.02.2010 | [2010/31] | Priority number, date | DE20091007226 | 03.02.2009 Original published format: DE102009007226 | [2010/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2213794 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2213794 | Date: | 03.10.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | E01B2/00, E03F5/04, E02F3/18, E02F5/06, E02F5/12 | [2012/40] | CPC: |
E01B2/00 (EP);
E01B29/00 (EP);
E01B29/32 (EP);
E01B37/00 (EP);
E02F3/181 (EP);
E02F5/06 (EP);
E02F5/12 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/31] | E01B2/00, E03F5/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Erstellen einer Entwässerungseinrichtung neben dem Gleis einer Bahnstrecke | [2010/31] | English: | Method for producing a water drainage device beside the track of a rail section | [2010/31] | French: | Procédé d'établissement d'un dispositif de drainage à côté du rail d'une voie ferrée | [2010/31] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/20] | 23.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/20] | 08.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.07.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2012 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.04.2012 | 28.02.2013 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.03.2013 | 28.02.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]DE10307753 (KUNZEWITSCH FELIX [DE]) [I] 1,2,8,10 * page 2, paragraph 8; figures 1-3; claims 1,5,6,9 * [A] 12,13,16; | [A]DE19858151 (HEILIT & WOERNER BAU AG [DE]) [A] 1-4,10,11 * column 5, line 35 - column 6, line 47; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4713898 (BULL TIMOTHY B H [US], et al) [A] 1-3,5,10,11 * figures 1-10; claim 1 *; | [A]EP1964973 (GESCHW BALTER BAUUNTERNEHMUNG [DE]) [A] 1,2,6-8,10-12 * column 18, paragraphs 64-65; figures 1-11; claims 1,2,4,5,6 *; | [A]DE10337977 (EMS GLEISBAU GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1,6-8,13 * page 2, paragraph 5; figures 1-2 * * page 3, paragraphs 13-14 * * page 4, paragraph 28 - page 5, paragraph 33 *; | [A]FR2646185 (DARIEL ANDRE [FR]) [A] 1 * figures 1-5 * |