EP2221719 - Next-step prediction system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.04.2015 [2015/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Telekom AG Friedrich-Ebert-Allee 140 53113 Bonn / DE | [2010/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rokach, Lior 1A Tamar Street Omer 84965 / IL | 02 /
Antwarg, Liat 11 Ravon Street Ganey Tiqva 55900 / IL | 03 /
Shapira, Bracha 35 Struma Street Beer-Sheva 84728 / IL | [2010/34] | Representative(s) | Flaccus, Rolf-Dieter Flaccus Müller-Wolff Patentanwälte Bussardweg 10 50389 Wesseling / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/34] | Flaccus, Rolf-Dieter Flaccus Müller-Wolff Patentanwälte Bussardweg 10 50389 Wesseling / DE | Application number, filing date | 10001497.6 | 15.02.2010 | [2010/34] | Priority number, date | IL20090197196 | 23.02.2009 Original published format: IL 19719609 | [2010/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2221719 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44 | [2010/34] | CPC: |
G06F9/453 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Voraussage des nächsten Schritts | [2010/34] | English: | Next-step prediction system and method | [2010/34] | French: | Système et procédé de prédiction d'étape suivante | [2010/34] | Examination procedure | 17.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/13] | 09.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/14] | 17.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.04.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP1742174 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [I] 1-9 * abstract ** paragraphs [0010] - [0013] - [0115] - [0118] - [0142]; figure 2 * | by applicant | US6418424 | US2009164395 | - HORVITZ E.; BREESE J.; HECKERMAN D.; HOVEL D.; ROMMELSE K, "The Lumiere project: Bayesian user modeling for inferring the goals and needs of software users", PROCEEDINGS OF THE FOURTEENTH CONFERENCE ON UNCERTAINTY IN ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE, (1998), pages 256 - 265, XP002686765 | - CHEN, Z.; LIN, F.; LIU, H.; LIU, Y.; MA, W.; WENYIN, L, "User Intention Modeling in Web Applications Using Data Mining", WORLD WIDE WEB, (200211), vol. 5, no. 3, pages 181 - 191 | - SHEN, J.; LI, L.; DIETTERICH, T. G; HERLOCKER, J. L., "A hybrid learning system for recognizing user tasks from desktop activities and email messages", PROCEEDINGS OF THE LLTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INTELLIGENT USER INTERFACES, (20060129), pages 86 - 92 |