blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2361947

EP2361947 - Plastic form body made of EPP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.01.2014
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip03.01.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.02.2014  [2014/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Truma Gerätetechnik GmbH & Co. KG
Wernher-von-Braun-Straße 12
85640 Putzbrunn / DE
For all designated states
Kunststoffwerk Katzbach GmbH & Co. KG
Ziegeleiweg 20
93413 Cham / DE
For all designated states
Mäder Plastilack AG
Reinhard-Reichnow-Straße 4
96129 Strullendorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/35]For all designated states
Truma Gerätetechnik GmbH & Co. KG
Wernher-von-Braun-Strasse 12
85640 Putzbrunn / DE
For all designated states
Kunststoffwerk Katzbach GmbH & Co. KG
Ziegeleiweg 20
93413 Cham / DE
For all designated states
Mäder Plastilack AG
Reinhard-Reichnow-Straße 4
96129 Strullendorf / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Schaurer, Oliver
Erdinger Str.43A
85445 Oberding / DE
02 / Krieger, Helmut, A.
Chamer Str.6
93499 Zandt / DE
03 / Letsch, Volker
An den Weihern 16a
96135 Stegaurach / DE
04 / Kestler, Georg
Josefstr.6
96114 Hirschaid / DE
05 / Konrad, Georg
Pestalozzistr.3
96129 Strullendorf / DE
06 / Ludwig, Andreas
Fasanenstrasse, 25
96114 Hirschaid / DE
07 / Jungbauer, Norbert
Alter Main 8
96179 Rattelsdorf-Ebing / DE
 [2011/44]
Former [2011/35]01 / Schaurer, Oliver
Erdinger Str.43A
85445 Oberding / DE
02 / Krieger, Helmut, A.
Chamer Str.6
93499 Zandt / DE
03 / Letsch, Volker
An den Weihern 16a
96135 Stegaurach / DE
04 / Kestler, Georg
Josefstr.6
96114 Hirschaid / DE
05 / Konrad, Georg
Pestalozzistr.3
96129 Strullendorf / DE
Representative(s)Müller Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
St.-Martin-Straße 58
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/35]Müller - Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
Application number, filing date10001782.122.02.2010
[2011/35]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2361947
Date:31.08.2011
Language:DE
[2011/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.05.2010
ClassificationIPC:C08J7/04, C08J9/36
[2011/35]
CPC:
B32B33/00 (EP); B29C63/0073 (EP); B32B2307/202 (EP);
B32B2307/3065 (EP); B32B2307/71 (EP); B32B2307/7145 (EP);
B32B2307/744 (EP); B32B2310/0445 (EP); B32B2310/14 (EP);
B32B2605/003 (EP); B32B38/0008 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/35]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Kunststoffformkörper aus EPP[2011/35]
English:Plastic form body made of EPP[2011/35]
French:Corps de formage plastique en EPP[2011/35]
Examination procedure29.02.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.02.2012Examination requested  [2012/15]
08.02.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.08.2013Observations by third parties
20.08.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/06]
24.09.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2014/06]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.02.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
30.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]DE19650143  (REICHENECKER HANS STOROPACK [DE]) [X] 1 * claim 1 ** column 2, line 8 - line 26 *
ExaminationDE102011005261
otherDE2721532
 US4129676
 DE3910901
 US5397602
 WO0238689
    - KITTEL H., Lehrbuch der Lacke und Beschichtungen, Band 9.2, (2004), pages 5, 24 - 37, 224 - 231, 236 - 241, 292 - 301, XP003031975
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.