EP2223804 - Lithographic printing plate precursor and plate making method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishi-azabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2010/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Shota Fujifilm Corporation 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | [2016/14] |
Former [2010/35] | 01 /
Suzuki, Shota Fujifilm Corporation 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2016/14] |
Former [2010/35] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10001942.1 | 25.02.2010 | [2010/35] | Priority number, date | JP20090044733 | 26.02.2009 Original published format: JP 2009044733 | JP20090202014 | 01.09.2009 Original published format: JP 2009202014 | [2010/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2223804 | Date: | 01.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2223804 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2223804 | Date: | 06.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B41C1/10, G03F7/105, G03F7/30 | [2012/32] | CPC: |
B41C1/1008 (EP,US);
G03F7/105 (EP,US);
G03F7/3035 (EP,US);
B41C1/1016 (EP,US);
B41C2201/02 (EP,US);
B41C2201/04 (EP,US);
B41C2201/10 (EP,US);
B41C2201/14 (EP,US);
B41C2210/04 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/35] | B41C1/10, G03F7/004 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/14] |
Former [2010/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Lithografiedruckplattenvorläufer und Plattenherstellungsverfahren dafür | [2010/35] | English: | Lithographic printing plate precursor and plate making method thereof | [2010/35] | French: | Précurseur de plaque d'impression lithographique et procédé de fabrication de plaque correspondant | [2010/35] | Examination procedure | 04.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/03] | 30.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.02.2010 | AT | 06.04.2016 | BE | 06.04.2016 | BG | 06.04.2016 | CY | 06.04.2016 | CZ | 06.04.2016 | DK | 06.04.2016 | EE | 06.04.2016 | ES | 06.04.2016 | FI | 06.04.2016 | HR | 06.04.2016 | IT | 06.04.2016 | LT | 06.04.2016 | LV | 06.04.2016 | MC | 06.04.2016 | MK | 06.04.2016 | NL | 06.04.2016 | PL | 06.04.2016 | RO | 06.04.2016 | SE | 06.04.2016 | SI | 06.04.2016 | SK | 06.04.2016 | SM | 06.04.2016 | TR | 06.04.2016 | NO | 06.07.2016 | GR | 07.07.2016 | IS | 06.08.2016 | PT | 08.08.2016 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 25.02.2010 | |
AT | 06.04.2016 | ||
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
CY | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
MK | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 25.02.2010 | |
AT | 06.04.2016 | ||
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
CY | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 25.02.2010 | |
AT | 06.04.2016 | ||
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 25.02.2010 | |
AT | 06.04.2016 | ||
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 06.04.2016 | |
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | LT | 06.04.2016 | |
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 06.04.2016 | |
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/44] | NL | 06.04.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9634316 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1-10* page 13, line 10 - line 23 *; | [AD]JP2003191657 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [AD] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0045] *; | [A]EP1457837 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0187] - paragraph [0189] *; | [A]EP1754614 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0297] *; | [A]EP1754597 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0130] * * paragraph [0144] - paragraph [0204] * * paragraph [0238] - paragraph [0260] *; | [AD]JP2007050660 (FUJIFILM CORP) [AD] 1-10 | by applicant | US2714066 | US2833827 | US3181461 | US3276868 | US3280734 | US3458311 | US3902734 | US4069055 | US4069056 | US4153461 | DE2904626 | JPS5549729B | EP0104143 | JPS61166544 | DE3604580 | DE3604581 | US4689272 | EP0233567 | US4734444 | US4760013 | EP0297443 | EP0297442 | EP0370693 | JPH02150848 | US4933377 | EP0390214 | JPH02304441 | JPH04365049 | JPH0545885 | JPH08108621 | JPH09123387 | JPH09131850 | JPH09171249 | JPH09171250 | JPH10282679 | EP0931647 | JPH11277927 | JP2000335129 | JP2001133969 | JP2001253181 | JP2001277740 | JP2001277742 | JP2001322365 | JP2002023360 | JP2002040638 | JP2002287334 | JP2002328465 | US2003064318 | JP2003191657 | JP2005119273 | JP2005125749 | JP2005329708 | JP2006091479 | JP2006188038 | JP2006297907 | JP2007050660 | JP2007090850 | JP2008195018 | JP2008233685 | JP2008284817 | US2008311520 | - S. I. SCHLESINGER, PHOTOGR. SCI. ENG., (1974), vol. 18, page 387 | - T. S. BAL ET AL., POLYMER, (1980), vol. 21, page 423 | - J.V. CRIVELLO ET AL., MACROMOLECULES, (1977), vol. 10, no. 6, page 1307 | - J.V. CRIVELLO ET AL., J. POLYMER SCI., POLYMER CHEM. ED., (1979), vol. 17, page 1047 | - C.S. WEN ET AL., TEH, PROC. CONF. RAD. CURING ASIA, (198810), page 478 |