EP2189623 - Generation of a pressure pulse of known magnitude [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2013 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For:FR
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger 42, rue Saint Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | For:GB
NL
Schlumberger Holdings Limited P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Road Town, Tortola / VG | For:BG
CZ
DE
DK
GR
HU
IE
IT
LT
PL
RO
SI
SK
TR
Schlumberger Technology B.V. Parkstraat 83-90 2514 JG The Hague / NL | For:AT
BE
CH
CY
EE
ES
FI
HR
IS
LI
LU
LV
MC
MT
NO
PT
SE
Prad Research And Development Ltd P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Road Town Tortola / VG | [N/P] |
Former [2012/39] | For:FR
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger 42, rue Saint Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | ||
For:GB
NL
Schlumberger Holdings Limited P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chamber Road Town Tortola / VG | |||
For:BG
CZ
DE
DK
GR
HU
IE
IT
LT
PL
RO
SI
SK
TR
Schlumberger Technology B.V. Parkstraat 83-90 2514 JG The Hague / NL | |||
For:AT
BE
CH
CY
EE
ES
FI
HR
IS
LI
LU
LV
MC
MT
NO
PT
SE
Prad Research And Development Ltd P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Road Town Tortola / VG | |||
Former [2012/21] | For:FR
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger 42, rue Saint Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | ||
For:GB
NL
Schlumberger Holdings Limited P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chamber Road Town Tortola / VG | |||
For:BG
CZ
DE
DK
GR
HU
IE
IT
LT
PL
RO
SI
SK
TR
Schlumberger Technology B.V. Parkstraat 83-90 2514 JG The Hague / NL | |||
For:AT
BE
CH
CY
EE
ES
FI
HR
IS
LI
LU
LV
MT
NO
PT
SE
Prad Research And Development Ltd P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Road Town Tortola / VG | |||
Former [2010/21] | For:FR
Services Petroliers Schlumberger, Dénommée Slb 42 Rue Saint Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | ||
For:GB
NL
Schlumberger Holdings Limited P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chamber Road Town Tortola / VG | |||
For:BG
CZ
DE
DK
GR
HU
IE
IT
LT
PL
RO
SI
SK
TR
Schlumberger Technology B.V. Parkstraat 83-90 2514 JG The Hague / NL | |||
For:BG
CZ
DE
DK
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LT
NL
PL
RO
SI
SK
TR
Prad Research And Development Ltd P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Road Town Tortola / VG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ramakrishnan, Terizhandur S. 1165 Hill Road Boxborough, MA 01719 / US | 02 /
Tombari, John 167 North Taylor Point Drive Spring, TX 77382 / US | [2010/21] | Representative(s) | Ford, Michael Frederick Schlumberger Cambridge Research Limited High Cross Madingley Road Cambridge CB3 0EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/40] | Ford, Michael Frederick Schlumberger Cambridge Research Limited High Cross Madingley Road Cambridge CB3 0EL / GB | ||
Former [2010/21] | Ford, Michael Frederick Schlumberger Cambridge Research Limited High Cross Madingley Road Cambridge CB3 0EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 10001978.5 | 02.07.2008 | [2010/21] | Priority number, date | US20070773175 | 03.07.2007 Original published format: US 773175 | [2010/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2189623 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2189623 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | [2010/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2189623 | Date: | 03.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | E21B47/00, E21B47/10, E21B49/00, E21B49/10, E21B41/00, F15B21/12, G01V1/137, E21B28/00 | [2010/34] | CPC: |
E21B28/00 (EP,US);
E21B47/005 (EP,US);
E21B41/0064 (EP,US);
E21B47/117 (EP,US);
E21B49/008 (EP,US);
E21B49/10 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/21] | E21B47/00, E21B47/10, E21B49/00, E21B49/10, E21B41/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/21] | Title | German: | Erzeugung eines Druckimpulses einer bekannten Größe | [2010/21] | English: | Generation of a pressure pulse of known magnitude | [2010/21] | French: | Génération d'impulsions à pression de magnitude connue | [2010/21] | Examination procedure | 25.02.2010 | Examination requested [2011/17] | 09.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.03.2012 | 20.03.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 07.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08781280.6 / EP2160503 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 04.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/37] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 09.03.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 09.03.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.03.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.07.2008 | AT | 03.10.2012 | BE | 03.10.2012 | CY | 03.10.2012 | CZ | 03.10.2012 | DK | 03.10.2012 | EE | 03.10.2012 | FI | 03.10.2012 | HR | 03.10.2012 | IT | 03.10.2012 | LT | 03.10.2012 | LV | 03.10.2012 | MC | 03.10.2012 | MT | 03.10.2012 | NL | 03.10.2012 | PL | 03.10.2012 | RO | 03.10.2012 | SE | 03.10.2012 | SI | 03.10.2012 | SK | 03.10.2012 | TR | 03.10.2012 | BG | 03.01.2013 | GR | 04.01.2013 | ES | 14.01.2013 | IS | 03.02.2013 | PT | 04.02.2013 | IE | 02.07.2013 | LU | 02.07.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
MC | 03.10.2012 | ||
MT | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
TR | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
IE | 02.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
MC | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
IE | 02.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
MC | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 03.10.2012 | |
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | BE | 03.10.2012 | |
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 03.10.2012 | |
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 03.10.2012 | |
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 03.10.2012 | |
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 03.10.2012 | |
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | SI | 03.10.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005284625 (RODNEY PAUL F [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0041] - [0046]; figure 6 *; | [A]WO2006034580 (IND SOUND TECHNOLOGIES INC [CA], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]FR2071513 (INST DOBYCHI UGLYA) [A] 1-13 * page 4, lines 1-26; figures 1,3 * | by applicant | US2005284625 | - VAN EVERDINGEN, A.F., THE SKIN EFFECT AND ITS INFLUENCE ON THE PRODUCTIVE CAPACITY OF A WELL, TRANS. AIME, (1953), vol. 198, pages 171 - 176 |