EP2237118 - Safety system for ensuring error-free control of electrical devices and safety device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.08.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/40] | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weber, Rupert Schulstrasse 14 63936 Schneeberg / DE | [2010/40] | Representative(s) | Thürer, Andreas Bosch Rexroth AG BR/IPR Zum Eisengiesser 1 97816 Lohr am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/39] | Thürer, Andreas Bosch Rexorth AG Zum Eisengießer 1 97816 Lohr am Main / DE | ||
Former [2010/40] | Thürer, Andreas Bosch Rexorth AG Zum Eisengießer 1 97816 Lohr am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 10002339.9 | 06.03.2010 | [2010/40] | Priority number, date | DE20091015683 | 31.03.2009 Original published format: DE102009015683 | [2010/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2237118 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2237118 | Date: | 25.09.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/042 | [2010/40] | CPC: |
G05B19/0421 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/40] | Title | German: | Sicherheitssystem zur Sicherung einer fehlersicheren Steuerung elektrischer Anlagen und Sicherheitssteuerung damit | [2010/40] | English: | Safety system for ensuring error-free control of electrical devices and safety device | [2010/40] | French: | Système de sécurité destiné à sécuriser la commande protégée contre l'erreur d'installations électriques et commande de sécurité équipée de celui-ci | [2010/40] | Examination procedure | 06.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/20] | 06.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 26.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.03.2010 | BG | 25.09.2013 | CY | 25.09.2013 | CZ | 25.09.2013 | DK | 25.09.2013 | EE | 25.09.2013 | ES | 25.09.2013 | FI | 25.09.2013 | HR | 25.09.2013 | IT | 25.09.2013 | LT | 25.09.2013 | LV | 25.09.2013 | MC | 25.09.2013 | MK | 25.09.2013 | MT | 25.09.2013 | NL | 25.09.2013 | PL | 25.09.2013 | RO | 25.09.2013 | SE | 25.09.2013 | SI | 25.09.2013 | SK | 25.09.2013 | SM | 25.09.2013 | TR | 25.09.2013 | NO | 25.12.2013 | GR | 26.12.2013 | IS | 25.01.2014 | PT | 27.01.2014 | GB | 06.03.2014 | IE | 06.03.2014 | LU | 06.03.2014 | BE | 31.03.2014 | CH | 31.03.2014 | FR | 31.03.2014 | LI | 31.03.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 06.03.2010 | |
BG | 25.09.2013 | ||
CY | 25.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
DK | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
IT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
MC | 25.09.2013 | ||
MT | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
PL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
SM | 25.09.2013 | ||
TR | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
GB | 06.03.2014 | ||
IE | 06.03.2014 | ||
LU | 06.03.2014 | ||
BE | 31.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 06.03.2010 | |
BG | 25.09.2013 | ||
CY | 25.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
DK | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
IT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
MC | 25.09.2013 | ||
MT | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
PL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
SM | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
GB | 06.03.2014 | ||
IE | 06.03.2014 | ||
LU | 06.03.2014 | ||
BE | 31.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 25.09.2013 | |
CY | 25.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
DK | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
IT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
MC | 25.09.2013 | ||
MT | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
PL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
SM | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
GB | 06.03.2014 | ||
IE | 06.03.2014 | ||
LU | 06.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | CY | 25.09.2013 | |
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
DK | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
IT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
MC | 25.09.2013 | ||
MT | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
PL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
SM | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
GB | 06.03.2014 | ||
IE | 06.03.2014 | ||
LU | 06.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 25.09.2013 | |
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
DK | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
IT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
MT | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
PL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
SM | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
GB | 06.03.2014 | ||
IE | 06.03.2014 | ||
LU | 06.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 25.09.2013 | |
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
DK | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
IT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
MT | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
PL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
GB | 06.03.2014 | ||
IE | 06.03.2014 | ||
LU | 06.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | CY | 25.09.2013 | |
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
DK | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
IT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
PL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
GB | 06.03.2014 | ||
IE | 06.03.2014 | ||
LU | 06.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 25.09.2013 | |
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
DK | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
IT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
PL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
IE | 06.03.2014 | ||
LU | 06.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | CY | 25.09.2013 | |
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
DK | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
IT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
PL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
IE | 06.03.2014 | ||
LU | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 25.09.2013 | |
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
DK | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
IT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
PL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
LU | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 25.09.2013 | |
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
DK | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
IT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
PL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | CY | 25.09.2013 | |
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
IT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
PL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | CY | 25.09.2013 | |
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
PL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | CY | 25.09.2013 | |
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
PL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CZ | 25.09.2013 | |
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
PL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CZ | 25.09.2013 | |
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 25.09.2013 | |
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | FI | 25.09.2013 | |
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | HR | 25.09.2013 | |
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 25.09.2013 | |
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 25.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2005036285 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE], et al) [X] 1-6,9-14 * page 1 * * page 4, paragraph 2 - page 5, paragraph 2 * * page 6, paragraph 2 * * page 9 - page 12, paragraph 2 * * figures 2,3b * [I] 7,8; | [X]WO03050624 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,13,14 * page 1 - page 2, line 2 * * page 5, paragraph 2 - page 6, paragraph 3 * * page 7, paragraph 4 * * page 8, paragraph 2 * | by applicant | WO2005036285 |