EP2369597 - Production of conductive surface coatings with dispersion with electrostatically stabilised silver nanoparticles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.05.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariant International AG Rothausstrasse 61 4132 Muttenz / CH | [2014/07] |
Former [2012/44] | For all designated states Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10 40789 Monheim / DE | ||
Former [2012/18] | For all designated states Bayer Technology Services GmbH 51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [2011/39] | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rudhardt, Daniel, Dr. Rotdornweg 24 50827 Köln / DE | 02 /
Eiden, Stefanie, Dr. Heinrich-Böll-Strasse 42 51371 Leverkusen / DE | 03 /
Storch, Dirk Domagk Strasse 14 51063 Köln / DE | 04 /
Schaedlich, Elsa Karoline, Dr. Nürnberger Strasse 17 04103 Leipzig / DE | 05 /
Sommerfeld, Sven Gustavstrasse 14 58332 Schwelm / DE | [2011/39] | Representative(s) | Schuck, Alexander, et al Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstraße 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/41] | Schuck, Alexander, et al Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Patentanwälte Seckenheimer Landstraße 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2013/01] | BIP Patents Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim / DE | ||
Former [2012/44] | Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim / DE | ||
Former [2011/39] | (deleted) | Application number, filing date | 10002605.3 | 12.03.2010 | [2011/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2369597 | Date: | 28.09.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2369597 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01B1/22 | [2011/39] | CPC: |
H01B1/22 (EP,US);
H01B13/00 (KR);
H01B1/02 (KR);
Y10S977/773 (EP,US);
Y10S977/892 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/39] | Title | German: | Herstellung leitfähiger Oberflächenbeschichtungen mit Dispersion mit elektrostatisch stabilisierten Silbernanopartikeln | [2011/39] | English: | Production of conductive surface coatings with dispersion with electrostatically stabilised silver nanoparticles | [2011/39] | French: | Fabrication de revêtements de surface conducteurs ayant une dispersion à nanoparticules d'argent stabilisées électrostatiquement | [2011/39] | Examination procedure | 21.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/24] | 03.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 25.06.2014 | CY | 25.06.2014 | CZ | 25.06.2014 | EE | 25.06.2014 | HR | 25.06.2014 | LT | 25.06.2014 | LV | 25.06.2014 | MC | 25.06.2014 | MK | 25.06.2014 | MT | 25.06.2014 | RO | 25.06.2014 | SI | 25.06.2014 | SK | 25.06.2014 | SM | 25.06.2014 | TR | 25.06.2014 | NO | 25.09.2014 | GR | 26.09.2014 | IS | 25.10.2014 | IE | 12.03.2015 | LU | 12.03.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/38] | BG | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
MT | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
SM | 25.06.2014 | ||
TR | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
IE | 12.03.2015 | ||
LU | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
MT | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
IE | 12.03.2015 | ||
LU | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
IE | 12.03.2015 | ||
LU | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
LU | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
LU | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 25.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO03038002 (YISSUM RES DEV CO [IL], et al); | [X]WO2005079353 (VIRGINIA TECH INTELL PROP [US], et al); | [A]EP1916671 (XEROX CORP [US]); | [X]WO2009044389 (NAT UNIV IRELAND [IE], et al); | [X]US2009104437 (BORTNER MICHAEL JEREMIAH [US], et al); | by applicant | EP1493780 |