EP2210764 - Battery module for electric vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.08.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.09.2015 [2015/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson Controls Saft Advanced Power Solutions LLC 1209 Orange Street Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | [2010/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAGHIKHANI, Majid 8731 Lake Pointe Dr. Franklin, Wisconsin 53132 / US | 02 /
MOLINE, Luke, L. 11735, 88th Ave West Olive Michigan 49460 / US | 03 /
MAKI, Jacob, G. 12566 County Road 408 Newberry Michigan 49868 / US | 04 /
MCCARTY, David, J. 280 Portchester Road Holland Michigan 49429 / US | [2010/30] | Representative(s) | Günther, Constantin, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Freundallee 13 a 30173 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/30] | Günther, Constantin, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner Freundallee 13 a 30173 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 10002621.0 | 05.09.2008 | [2010/30] | Priority number, date | US20070970853P | 07.09.2007 Original published format: US 970853 P | [2010/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2210764 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2210764 | Date: | 03.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B60L11/18, H02J7/00, H01R13/717, H01M10/625, H01M10/6563 | [2014/36] | CPC: |
B60L1/003 (EP,US);
B60L3/0046 (EP,US);
B60L3/0069 (EP,US);
B60L50/64 (EP,US);
B60L50/66 (EP,US);
B60L53/16 (EP,US);
B60L53/305 (EP,US);
B60L58/12 (EP,US);
B60L58/24 (EP);
B60L58/26 (EP,US);
B60L58/27 (EP,US);
H01M10/488 (EP,US);
H01M10/613 (EP,US);
H01M10/617 (EP,US);
H01M10/625 (EP,US);
H01M10/6563 (EP,US);
H01M50/213 (EP,US);
H01M50/249 (EP,US);
H01M50/271 (EP,US);
H01R13/641 (EP,US);
H02J7/0047 (EP,US);
B60L2200/12 (EP,US);
B60L2200/18 (EP,US);
B60L2200/32 (EP,US);
B60L2200/36 (EP,US);
B60L2240/545 (EP,US);
B60L2240/547 (EP,US);
B60L2250/10 (EP,US);
B60L2250/16 (EP,US);
B60L2260/28 (EP,US);
H01M2010/4271 (EP,US);
H02J7/0048 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
Y02T10/7072 (EP,US);
Y02T90/12 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/30] | B60L11/18, H02J7/00, H01R13/717 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/30] | Title | German: | Batteriemodul für Elektrofahrzeuge | [2010/30] | English: | Battery module for electric vehicles | [2010/30] | French: | Module des batteries pour véhicules electriques | [2010/30] | Examination procedure | 12.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/30] | 04.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/39] | 14.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/39] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08831042.0 / WO2009035531 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3942470 (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [DE]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 21 - line 65 *; | [A]EP1156537 (SHIN KOBE ELECTRIC MACHINERY [JP]) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0030] *; | [XI]US2003211384 (HAMADA SHINJI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document * [I] 2-15; | [I]US2006115714 (LEE GUN-GOO [KR], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0064]; figure 4 *; | [IP]US2008124627 (SHIMOYAMA YOSHIRO [JP]) [IP] 1-15 * paragraph [0033]; figure 5b *; | [AP]WO2008086212 (JOHNSON CONTROLS SAFT ADVANCED [US], et al) [AP] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2008US56078 |