EP2367215 - An organic photoactive device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.04.2019 [2019/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novaled GmbH Tatzberg 49 01307 Dresden / DE | [2019/15] |
Former [2011/38] | For all designated states Novaled AG Tatzberg 49 01307 Dresden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dr. Lessmann Rudolf Gerokstrasse 26 01307 Dresden / DE | 02 /
Dr.Werner Ansgar Maystrasse 32 01277 Dresden / DE | 03 /
Rothe Carsten Pillnitzer Landstrasse 184 01326 Dresden / DE | [2011/38] | Representative(s) | Bittner, Thomas L. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/38] | Bittner, Thomas L. Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10002693.9 | 15.03.2010 | [2011/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2367215 | Date: | 21.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/50 | [2011/38] | CPC: |
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
H10K50/14 (EP,US);
H10K30/211 (EP,US);
H10K30/40 (EP);
H10K50/00 (US);
H10K50/11 (EP,US);
H10K50/155 (EP,US);
H10K50/165 (EP,US);
H10K2101/40 (EP,US);
H10K2102/351 (EP,US);
H10K30/50 (EP);
H10K50/18 (US);
H10K85/211 (EP,US);
H10K85/341 (EP,US);
H10K85/631 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Organische photoaktive Vorrichtung | [2011/38] | English: | An organic photoactive device | [2011/38] | French: | Dispositif photoactif organique | [2011/38] | Examination procedure | 17.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/38] | 28.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 24.02.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 11.03.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/17] | Appeal following examination | 29.04.2014 | Appeal received No. T1505/14 | 02.07.2014 | Statement of grounds filed | 11.03.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.10.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1801882 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]); | [XI]US2007231596 (SPINDLER JEFFREY P [US], et al); | [XI]US2009160319 (SONG WON-JUN [KR], et al); | [A]US2009283757 (SEO SATOSHI [JP], et al); | by applicant | EP1801882 | US2007231596 | US2009160319 | US2009283757 |