EP2281478 - Mascara brush with eyelash retention part [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEKA GmbH 91572 Bechhofen / DE | [2011/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kulik, Daniela Spitalstraße 4 91555 Feuchtwangen / DE | [2011/06] | Representative(s) | Misselhorn, Hein-Martin, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwalt Am Stein 10 85049 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/29] | Misselhorn, Hein-Martin, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwalt Donaustrasse 6 85049 Ingolstadt / DE | ||
Former [2012/15] | Misselhorn, Hein-Martin, et al Misselhorn Wall Patent- und Rechtsanwälte GbR Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/06] | nospat Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Naefe Oberdorfer Schmidt Isartorplatz 5 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10002711.9 | 15.03.2010 | [2011/06] | Priority number, date | DE20091035390 | 30.07.2009 Original published format: DE102009035390 | [2011/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2281478 | Date: | 09.02.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2281478 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | [2011/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2281478 | Date: | 09.09.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A46B9/02 | [2011/06] | CPC: |
A46B9/021 (EP);
A46B9/06 (EP);
A46D1/00 (EP);
A46D1/0284 (EP);
A46B2200/1053 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/37] |
Former [2011/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Mascara-Bürste mit Wimpernrückhalteorgan | [2011/06] | English: | Mascara brush with eyelash retention part | [2011/06] | French: | Brosse à mascara dotée d'un organe de soutien des cils | [2011/06] | Examination procedure | 27.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/50] | 31.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.03.2010 | BG | 09.09.2015 | CY | 09.09.2015 | CZ | 09.09.2015 | DK | 09.09.2015 | EE | 09.09.2015 | ES | 09.09.2015 | FI | 09.09.2015 | HR | 09.09.2015 | IT | 09.09.2015 | LT | 09.09.2015 | LV | 09.09.2015 | MC | 09.09.2015 | MK | 09.09.2015 | MT | 09.09.2015 | NL | 09.09.2015 | PL | 09.09.2015 | RO | 09.09.2015 | SE | 09.09.2015 | SI | 09.09.2015 | SK | 09.09.2015 | SM | 09.09.2015 | TR | 09.09.2015 | NO | 09.12.2015 | GR | 10.12.2015 | IS | 09.01.2016 | PT | 11.01.2016 | AT | 15.03.2016 | IE | 15.03.2016 | LU | 15.03.2016 | BE | 31.03.2016 | CH | 31.03.2016 | LI | 31.03.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 15.03.2010 | |
CY | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
MK | 09.09.2015 | ||
MT | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
SM | 09.09.2015 | ||
TR | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
AT | 15.03.2016 | ||
IE | 15.03.2016 | ||
LU | 15.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 15.03.2010 | |
CY | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
MK | 09.09.2015 | ||
MT | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
SM | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
AT | 15.03.2016 | ||
IE | 15.03.2016 | ||
LU | 15.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/45] | CZ | 09.09.2015 | |
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
MT | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
AT | 15.03.2016 | ||
IE | 15.03.2016 | ||
LU | 15.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 09.09.2015 | |
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
IE | 15.03.2016 | ||
LU | 15.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 09.09.2015 | |
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
LU | 15.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | CZ | 09.09.2015 | |
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
LU | 15.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | CZ | 09.09.2015 | |
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 09.09.2015 | |
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 09.09.2015 | |
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 09.09.2015 | |
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 09.09.2015 | |
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 09.09.2015 | |
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | ES | 09.09.2015 | |
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 09.09.2015 | |
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 09.09.2015 | |
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 09.09.2015 | |
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 09.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2003079427 (SHISEIDO CO LTD) [X] 1-6,16 * paragraphs [0011] , [0013]; figures 1-7 * * abstract * [Y] 7-9,17; | [Y]EP1611817 (OREAL [FR]) [Y] 7,9,17 * figures 1,9l,16 *; | [X]US4561456 (GUERET JEAN-LOUIS H [FR]) [X] 1-6 * figures 1-6 *; | [A]US2004011375 (DUMLER NORBERT [DE]) [A] 7,9 * figures 10,47 *; | [A]US2005150509 (GUERET JEAN-LOUIS H [FR]) [A] 7 * figure 18 *; | [YA]US2006279181 (GUERET JEAN-LOUIS [FR]) [Y] 15 * figure 10 * [A] 7,9; | [YA]WO2006124228 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [Y] 8 * figures 1,12-15 * [A] 1; | [A]US2008283078 (DUMLER NORBERT [DE], et al) [A] 8 * figure 5 *; | [A]US2007256700 (BODELIN SOPHIE [FR]) [A] 8 * paragraph [0024]; figure 24 *; | [X]US4958402 (WEIHRAUCH GEORG [DE]) [X] 10 * figure 3 *; | [X]JP2003299522 (SHINOHARA KK) [X] 10 * figures 2,3 *; | [A]US4993440 (GUERET JEAN-LOUIS [FR]) [A] 10 * figure 4 *; | [A]EP1454561 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1,10 * paragraph [0079]; figures 37,38 *; | [A]US5063947 (GUERET JEAN-LOUIS [FR]) [A] 10 * figures 9-13 *; | [A]US6616366 (WEIHRAUCH GEORG [DE]) [A] 10 * figures 5, 13 *; | [A]US2003230317 (MONTOLI ANTONIO [US], et al) [A] 10 * figure 3 *; | [XA]US2006272667 (WYATT PETER J [US], et al) [X] 1,8 * figures 24,25,57B,83 * [A] 10; | [XY]WO2008125987 (ALCAN PACKAGING BEAUTY SERV [FR], et al) [X] 11,12,14 * page 1, line 8; figure 3B * * page 9, line 21 * [Y] 15; | [A]JP2009131334 (PENTEL KK) [A] 10,11 * paragraph [0133]; figures 3,9 *; | [A]JP2008307304 (TOKYO PARTS KK) [A] 10,11 * figures 2-4,6,7,8,12 * |