Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
21.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] |
28.12.2011 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
22.04.2011 | Publication of search report | published on 25.05.2011 [2011/21] |
27.08.2010 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.09.2010 [2010/39] |