EP2233811 - Plastic pipe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.04.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Poloplast GmbH & Co. KG Poloplast-Strasse 1 4060 Leonding / AT | [2010/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mayrbäurl, Erwin Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Brausmühlstrasse 2 4481 Asten / AT | 02 /
Miethlinger, Jürgen Karl, Dr. Schwarzmoos 32 4851 Gampern / AT | [2010/39] | Representative(s) | Schaeberle, Steffen Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/39] | Schaeberle, Steffen Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10003156.6 | 24.03.2010 | [2010/39] | Priority number, date | DE20091014534 | 24.03.2009 Original published format: DE102009014534 | [2010/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2233811 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2233811 | Date: | 25.05.2011 | [2011/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F16L9/12 | [2010/39] | CPC: |
F16L9/121 (EP);
B32B1/08 (EP);
B32B27/12 (EP);
B32B27/18 (EP);
B32B27/302 (EP);
B32B27/304 (EP);
B32B27/308 (EP);
B32B27/32 (EP);
B32B27/34 (EP);
B32B5/02 (EP);
B32B5/18 (EP);
B32B5/22 (EP);
B32B5/245 (EP);
B32B7/12 (EP);
F16L9/12 (EP);
F16L9/123 (EP);
B32B2262/0269 (EP);
B32B2262/06 (EP);
B32B2262/08 (EP);
B32B2262/101 (EP);
B32B2262/106 (EP);
B32B2262/108 (EP);
B32B2307/308 (EP);
B32B2307/50 (EP);
B32B2307/546 (EP);
B32B2307/714 (EP);
B32B2307/7242 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kunststoffrohr | [2010/39] | English: | Plastic pipe | [2010/39] | French: | Tuyau en plastique | [2010/39] | Examination procedure | 26.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/21] | 03.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/21] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US6176269 (JAERVENKYLAE JYRI [FI]) [X] 1,2,4,6,10-12 * figure 1 * * column 2, line 38 - line 42 * * column 4, line 29 - line 36 * * column 4, line 56 - line 58 * * column 5, line 34 - line 58 * * column 9, line 1 - line 4 * [Y] 7,9 [I] 3,5,8; | [XI]US4351364 (COCKS PHILIP J) [X] 1,2,6,7 * abstract * [I] 3-5,8; | [Y]WO9221908 (ADVANCED MATERIALS AS [NO]) [Y] 7,9 * abstract *; | [X]GB1177249 (WAVIN BV [NL]) [X] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE102004010340 | DE10018324 | DE102007035657 | AT316228B | AT360286B |