30.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] |
18.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] |
22.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] |
18.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] |
04.10.2013 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] |
09.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] |
19.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
12.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] |
28.06.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2013 [2013/31] |
07.06.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.07.2013 [2013/28] |
31.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.07.2013 [2013/27] |
10.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2013 [2013/24] |
26.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] |
19.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] |
26.10.2012 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.11.2012 [2012/48] |
12.10.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
12.10.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
13.07.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
16.11.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.11.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 14.12.2011 [2011/50] |
04.11.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
07.10.2011 |
Change - representative |
published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] |
24.06.2011 |
Change - representative |
published on 27.07.2011 [2011/30] |
22.04.2011 |
Publication of search report |
published on 25.05.2011 [2011/21] |
22.04.2011 |
Change - classification |
published on 25.05.2011 [2011/21] |
23.11.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.05.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.06.2010 [2010/24] |
13.04.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|