Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1339599 | Global Dossier | 30.05.2012 | B1 | EP1339599 | 03.09.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB0029136 | 29.11.2000 | GB0105294 | 29.11.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU1619502 | Global Dossier | 11.06.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0029136 | 29.11.2000 | GB0105294 | 29.11.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2196386 | Global Dossier | 28.11.2012 | B1 | EP2196386 | 25.05.2011 | A3 | EP2196386 | 16.06.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB0029136 | 29.11.2000 | EP01998472 | 29.11.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2388059T | 08.10.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB0029136 | 29.11.2000 | GB0105294 | 29.11.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0244008 | Global Dossier | 12.09.2002 | A3 | WO0244008 | 06.06.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB0029136 | 29.11.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2397602T | 08.03.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB0029136 | 29.11.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB0029136D0 | 10.01.2001 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0029136 | 29.11.2000 | Type | Earlier application | EP1339599 |