EP2251439 - Nucleic acid amplification method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2014 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olink AB Dag Hammarskjölds väg 54A 751 83 Uppsala / SE | [2010/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Landegren, Ulf Norra Parkvägen 29 756 45 Uppsala / SE | 02 /
Gullberg, Mats Rådjursstigen 64 191 46 Sollentuna / SE | 03 /
Nilsson, Mats Allévägen 4 167 52 Bromma / SE | [2010/46] | Representative(s) | Dzieglewska, Hanna Eva Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/37] | Dzieglewska, Hanna Eva Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2010/46] | Dzieglewska, Hanna Eva Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 10003586.4 | 12.07.2002 | [2010/46] | Priority number, date | GB20010018959 | 03.08.2001 Original published format: GB 0118959 | [2010/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2251439 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2251439 | Date: | 11.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2010/46] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6848 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6848, C12Q2561/113, C12Q2531/125, C12Q2525/131 (US,EP);
C12Q1/6848, C12Q2561/125, C12Q2531/125, C12Q2525/131 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6848, C12Q2565/501, C12Q2531/125, C12Q2525/131 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2010/46] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Amplifikation von Nukleinsäure | [2010/46] | English: | Nucleic acid amplification method | [2010/46] | French: | Procédé d'amplification d'acide nucléique | [2010/46] | Examination procedure | 16.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/25] | 05.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02741612.2 / EP1423532 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020741612) is 01.12.2006 | Opposition(s) | 12.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.09.2013 | BE | 11.09.2013 | BG | 11.09.2013 | CY | 11.09.2013 | CZ | 11.09.2013 | DK | 11.09.2013 | EE | 11.09.2013 | ES | 11.09.2013 | FI | 11.09.2013 | IT | 11.09.2013 | MC | 11.09.2013 | NL | 11.09.2013 | SE | 11.09.2013 | SK | 11.09.2013 | TR | 11.09.2013 | GR | 12.12.2013 | PT | 13.01.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/25] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
BG | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
ES | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
IT | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
NL | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
ES | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
IT | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
NL | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
ES | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
IT | 11.09.2013 | ||
NL | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
ES | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
IT | 11.09.2013 | ||
NL | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
ES | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
NL | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
ES | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
NL | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 11.09.2013 | |
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
NL | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | BE | 11.09.2013 | |
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
NL | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | BE | 11.09.2013 | |
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 11.09.2013 | |
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 11.09.2013 | |
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | SE | 11.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6183960 (LIZARDI PAUL M [MX]) [X] 1-9 * col. 3, lines 14-30; col. 5, lines 20-23; col. 5, line 60 - col. 6, line 3; col. 7, lines 11-15; col. 10, line 39 - line 60; col. 11, lines 50-67; col. 21, line 33 - col. 22, line 23; col. 23, lines 5-40 *; | [X]WO9949079 (LANDEGREN ULF [SE]) [X] 1-3,6-9 * page 13, lines 9-29; Fig. 5 *; | [A]WO0006778 (NEW YORK HEALTH RES INST [US]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | [A] - LIZARDI P M ET AL, "MUTATION DETECTION AND SINGLE-MOLECULE COUNTING USING ISOTHERMAL ROLLING-CIRCLE AMPLIFICATION", NATURE GENETICS, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, US LNKD- DOI:10.1038/898, (19980701), vol. 19, no. 3, ISSN 1061-4036, pages 225 - 232, XP000856939 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/898 | by applicant | US5854033 | US6124120 | US6143495 | US6183960 | US6210884 | WO9949079 | WO9201813 | US5714320 | JPH04304900 | WO0036141 | - BANÉR J.; NILSSON M.; MENDEL-HARTVIG M.; LANDEGREN U., "Signal amplification of padlock probes by rolling circle replication", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1998), vol. 22, pages 5073 - 5078 | - CARMI N.; BALKHI S. R.; BREAKER R. R., "Cleaving DNA with DNA", PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (1998), vol. 95, pages 2233 - 7 | - COPLEY C. G.; BOOT C., "Exonuclease cycling assay: an amplified assay for the detection of specific DNA sequences", BIOTECHNIQUES, (1992), vol. 13, pages 888 - 92, XP002060879 | - CUENOUD B.; SZOSTAK J. W., "A DNA metalloenzyme with DNA ligase activity", NATURE, (1995), vol. 375, doi:doi:10.1038/375611a0, pages 611 - 4, XP002119813 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/375611a0 | - DAUBENDIEK, S.L.; KOOL, E.T., "Generation of catalytic RNAs by rolling transcription of synthetic DNA nanocirdes", NAT BIOTECHNOL, (1997), vol. 15, doi:doi:10.1038/nbt0397-273, pages 273 - 277, XP002071364 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0397-273 | - DAUWERSE, J.G.; WIEGANT, J.; RAAP, A.K.; BREUNING, M.H.; VAN OMMEN, G.-J.B., "Multiple colors by fluorescence in situ hybridization using ratio-labelled DNA probes create a molecular karyotype", HUM MOL GENET, (1992), vol. 1, pages 593 - 598 | - HERSCHLAG D.; CECH T. R., "DNA cleavage catalysed. by the ribozyme from Tetrahymena", NATURE, (1990), vol. 344, pages 405 - 9 | - HEID C.A.; STEVENS J.; LIVAK K.J.; WILLIAMS P.M., "Real time quantitative PCR", GENOME RESEARCH, (1996), vol. 6, pages 986 - 994 | - LIZARDI P. M.; HUANG X.; ZHU Z.; BRAY-WARD P.; THOMAS D. C.; WARD D. C., "Mutation detection and single-molecule counting using isothermal rolling-circle amplification", NATURE GENET., (1998), vol. 19, doi:doi:10.1038/898, pages 225 - 232, XP002922815 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/898 | - LYAMICHEV V.; MAST A. L.; HALL J. G.; PRUDENT J. R.; KAISER M. W.; TAKOVA T.; KWIATKOWSKI R. W.; SANDER T. J.; DE ARRUDA M.; ARCO, "Polymorphism identification and quantitative detection of genomic DNA by invasive cleavage of oligonucleotide probes", NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (1999), vol. 17, doi:doi:10.1038/7044, pages 292 - 296, XP002121762 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/7044 | - NEDERLOF, P.M.; VAN, D.F.S.; VROLIJK, J.; TANKE, H.J.; RAAP, A.K., "Fluorescence ratio measurements of double-labeled probes for multiple in situ hybridization by digital imaging microscopy", CYTOMETRY, (1992), vol. 13, doi:doi:10.1002/cyto.990130806, pages 839 - 845, XP002964616 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cyto.990130806 | - NILSSON, M.; MALMGREN, H.; SAMIOTAKI, M.; KWIATKOWSKI, M.; CHOWDHARY, B.P.; LANDEGREN, U., "Padlock probes: Circularizing oligonucleotides for localized DNA detection", SCIENCE, (1994), vol. 265, pages 2085 - 2088 | - TYAGI S.; KRAMER F. R., "Molecular beacons: probes that fluoresce upon hybridization", NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (1996), vol. 14, doi:doi:10.1038/nbt0396-303, pages 303 - 308, XP002914999 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0396-303 |