EP2210863 - Equipment for treating ammonium containing liquid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.2011 [2011/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Plant Technologies, Ltd. 5-2, Higashi-Ikebukuro 4-chome Toshima-ku Tokyo 170-8466 / JP | [2010/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sumino, Tatsuo c/o Hitachi Plant Technologies, Ltd. 5-2, Higashi-Ikebukuro 4-chome Toshima-ku Tokyo 170-8466 / JP | 02 /
Isaka, Kazuichi c/o Hitachi Plant Technologies, Ltd. 5-2, Higashi-Ikebukuro 4-chome Toshima-ku Tokyo 170-8466 / JP | [2010/30] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/30] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10003956.9 | 27.02.2006 | [2010/30] | Priority number, date | JP20050054423 | 28.02.2005 Original published format: JP 2005054423 | JP20050061375 | 04.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005061375 | JP20050145785 | 18.05.2005 Original published format: JP 2005145785 | [2010/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2210863 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/30 | [2010/30] | CPC: |
C02F3/302 (EP,US);
C02F3/30 (KR);
C02F3/2806 (EP,US);
C02F2101/16 (EP,US);
Y10S210/903 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/30] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Behandlung einer Ammonium enthaltenden Flüssigkeit | [2010/30] | English: | Equipment for treating ammonium containing liquid | [2010/30] | French: | Dispositif pour le traitement d'un liquide contenant d'ammonium. | [2010/30] | Examination procedure | 29.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/30] | 08.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/30] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06003940.1 / EP1695941 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060003940) is 23.02.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0509152 (ECOTECHNIEK BV [NL]) [X] 1-3,6-11,15,19,20 * figure 11 * * example 1 * [I] 4,11,16,18,21-23; | [XI]EP0634368 (SEKOULOV IVAN PROF DR ING [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-12,14,15,17,19,20 * figure 4.2.1 * * figure 4.2.2 * * claims 7-9 * * column 4 - column 5 * [I] 4,13,16,18,21-23; | [A]US6033569 (SUMINO TATSUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-23* figure 17 * | by applicant | JP2001037467 |