EP2338679 - Protective covering [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.12.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 15.02.2023 [2023/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kirchner GmbH Tiroler Straße 85 70329 Stuttgart / DE | [2011/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kirchner, Joachim Tirolerstrasse 85 70329 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
Kirchner, Oliver Heidestrasse 37/2 73733 Esslingen / DE | [2011/26] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Magenbauer & Kollegen Partnerschaft mbB Plochinger Straße 109 73730 Esslingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/26] | Kocher, Mark Werner, et al Magenbauer & Kollegen Patentanwälte Plochinger Strasse 109 73730 Esslingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 10003964.3 | 15.04.2010 | [2011/26] | Priority number, date | DE20092017084U | 19.12.2009 Original published format: DE 202009017084 U | [2011/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2338679 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2338679 | Date: | 23.01.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A47G27/02, C09J7/02, B32B7/12, B32B27/12 | [2012/33] | CPC: |
B32B27/12 (EP,US);
A47G27/0206 (EP);
B32B7/12 (EP);
C09J7/29 (EP,US);
B05B12/20 (EP);
C09J2400/263 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/26] | B32B7/12, B32B27/12, C09J7/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/26] | Title | German: | Schutzabdeckung | [2011/26] | English: | Protective covering | [2011/26] | French: | Revêtement de protection | [2011/26] | Examination procedure | 18.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/40] | 02.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.06.2013
27.10.2014
INADMISSIBLE regeneracija gmbh Eisentalstrasse 23 71332 Waiblingen / DE | 02
11.09.2013
27.10.2014
INADMISSIBLE Lindner Haushaltsprodukte GmbH Fuggerstrasse 1 51149 Köln / DE Opponent's representative Collet, Claus Fuggerstraße 15 51149 Köln / DE | [2015/12] |
Former [2013/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.06.2013
03.09.2013
ADMISSIBLE regeneracija gmbh Eisentalstrasse 23 71332 Waiblingen / DE | ||
02
11.09.2013
17.09.2013
ADMISSIBLE Lindner Haushaltsprodukte GmbH Fuggerstrasse 1 51149 Köln / DE Opponent's representative Collet, Claus Fuggerstraße 15 51149 Köln / DE | |||
Former [2013/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.06.2013
03.09.2013
ADMISSIBLE regeneracija gmbh Eisentalstrasse 23 71332 Waiblingen / DE | ||
02
11.09.2013
Lindner Haushaltsprodukte GmbH Fuggerstrasse 1 51149 Köln / DE | |||
Former [2013/30] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.06.2013
INADMISSIBLE regeneracija gmbh Eisentalstrasse 23 71332 Waiblingen / DE | 26.11.2013 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.01.2014 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 27.10.2014 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: opposition inadmissible 01, 02 | 07.11.2014 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular right | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.04.2010 | CY | 23.01.2013 | CZ | 23.01.2013 | EE | 23.01.2013 | FI | 23.01.2013 | HR | 23.01.2013 | LT | 23.01.2013 | LV | 23.01.2013 | MC | 23.01.2013 | MK | 23.01.2013 | MT | 23.01.2013 | RO | 23.01.2013 | SE | 23.01.2013 | SI | 23.01.2013 | SK | 23.01.2013 | SM | 23.01.2013 | TR | 23.01.2013 | IE | 15.04.2013 | LU | 15.04.2013 | BG | 23.04.2013 | NO | 23.04.2013 | GR | 24.04.2013 | IS | 23.05.2013 | PT | 23.05.2013 | PL | 15.04.2017 | ES | 16.04.2017 | BE | 30.04.2017 | DK | 30.04.2017 | IT | 15.04.2018 | CH | 30.04.2018 | FR | 30.04.2018 | LI | 30.04.2018 | NL | 01.05.2018 | GB | 15.04.2019 | AT | 15.04.2022 | [2023/07] |
Former [2020/11] | HU | 15.04.2010 | |
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 23.01.2013 | ||
MK | 23.01.2013 | ||
MT | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
SM | 23.01.2013 | ||
TR | 23.01.2013 | ||
IE | 15.04.2013 | ||
LU | 15.04.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.04.2017 | ||
ES | 16.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
DK | 30.04.2017 | ||
IT | 15.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
FR | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
NL | 01.05.2018 | ||
GB | 15.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | HU | 15.04.2010 | |
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 23.01.2013 | ||
MK | 23.01.2013 | ||
MT | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
SM | 23.01.2013 | ||
TR | 23.01.2013 | ||
IE | 15.04.2013 | ||
LU | 15.04.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.04.2017 | ||
ES | 16.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
DK | 30.04.2017 | ||
IT | 15.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
FR | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
NL | 01.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | HU | 15.04.2010 | |
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 23.01.2013 | ||
MK | 23.01.2013 | ||
MT | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
SM | 23.01.2013 | ||
TR | 23.01.2013 | ||
IE | 15.04.2013 | ||
LU | 15.04.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.04.2017 | ||
ES | 16.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
DK | 30.04.2017 | ||
IT | 15.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
NL | 01.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | HU | 15.04.2010 | |
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 23.01.2013 | ||
MK | 23.01.2013 | ||
MT | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
SM | 23.01.2013 | ||
TR | 23.01.2013 | ||
IE | 15.04.2013 | ||
LU | 15.04.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.04.2017 | ||
ES | 16.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
DK | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
NL | 01.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | HU | 15.04.2010 | |
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 23.01.2013 | ||
MK | 23.01.2013 | ||
MT | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
SM | 23.01.2013 | ||
TR | 23.01.2013 | ||
IE | 15.04.2013 | ||
LU | 15.04.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.04.2017 | ||
ES | 16.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
DK | 30.04.2017 | ||
NL | 01.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | HU | 15.04.2010 | |
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 23.01.2013 | ||
MK | 23.01.2013 | ||
MT | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
SM | 23.01.2013 | ||
TR | 23.01.2013 | ||
IE | 15.04.2013 | ||
LU | 15.04.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.04.2017 | ||
ES | 16.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
DK | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 15.04.2010 | |
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 23.01.2013 | ||
MK | 23.01.2013 | ||
MT | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
SM | 23.01.2013 | ||
TR | 23.01.2013 | ||
IE | 15.04.2013 | ||
LU | 15.04.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
ES | 16.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
DK | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | HU | 15.04.2010 | |
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 23.01.2013 | ||
MK | 23.01.2013 | ||
MT | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
SM | 23.01.2013 | ||
TR | 23.01.2013 | ||
IE | 15.04.2013 | ||
LU | 15.04.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
DK | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | HU | 15.04.2010 | |
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 23.01.2013 | ||
MK | 23.01.2013 | ||
MT | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
SM | 23.01.2013 | ||
TR | 23.01.2013 | ||
IE | 15.04.2013 | ||
LU | 15.04.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
DK | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 15.04.2010 | |
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 23.01.2013 | ||
MK | 23.01.2013 | ||
MT | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
SM | 23.01.2013 | ||
TR | 23.01.2013 | ||
IE | 15.04.2013 | ||
LU | 15.04.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 23.01.2013 | |
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 23.01.2013 | ||
MK | 23.01.2013 | ||
MT | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
SM | 23.01.2013 | ||
TR | 23.01.2013 | ||
IE | 15.04.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 23.01.2013 | |
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 23.01.2013 | ||
MT | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
SM | 23.01.2013 | ||
IE | 15.04.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | CY | 23.01.2013 | |
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 23.01.2013 | ||
MT | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
IE | 15.04.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 23.01.2013 | |
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
IE | 15.04.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/01] | CY | 23.01.2013 | |
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 23.01.2013 | |
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | CZ | 23.01.2013 | |
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | FI | 23.01.2013 | |
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | FI | 23.01.2013 | |
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | FI | 23.01.2013 | |
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 23.01.2013 | |
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 23.01.2013 | |
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 23.01.2013 | |
NO | 23.04.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE29806536U (WIRZ PETER [DE]) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [A]EP0959119 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0012]; figures 1,2; claims 1-4 *; | [XI]US2003073369 (CHEN HSI JEN [TW]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0013]; figure 2; claims 1-6 * [I] 2-11; | [X]WO2009078787 (MOELNLYCKE HEALTH CARE AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-11 * page 6, line 8 - line 15; figure 3; claims 1-7 *; | [X]US2009173425 (SAMMONS LYNNE A [US]) [X] 1-11 * paragraphs [0045] - [0060]; figure 4; example 1; claims 1-21 * | by applicant | DE9413289U |