EP2228816 - Fluorescent lamp and base [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.11.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.12.2012 [2012/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Osram-Melco Ltd. 8-29, Kita-Saiwai 2-chome, Nishi-ku Yokohama Kanagawa 220-0004 / JP | [2010/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ikeda, Mitsuhiro c/o Osram-Melco Limited Kakegawa Factory 64, Tanyo Kakegawa Shizuoka 436-0082 / JP | 02 /
Osawa, Takashi c/o Osram-Melco Limited Kakegawa Factory 64, Tanyo Kakegawa Shizuoka 436-0082 / JP | 03 /
Takeda, Masaomi c/o Osram-Melco Limited Kakegawa Factory 64, Tanyo Kakegawa Shizuoka 436-0082 / JP | 04 /
Kokufu, Koji c/o Osram-Melco Limited Kakegawa Factory 64, Tanyo Kakegawa Shizuoka 436-0082 / JP | [2012/03] |
Former [2010/37] | 01 /
Ikeda, Mitsuhiro c/o Osram-Melco Limited Kakegawa Factory 64, Tanyo Kakegawa Shizuoka 436-0082 / JP | ||
02 /
Osawa, Takashi c/o Osram-Melco Limited Kakegawa Factory 64, Tanyo Kakegawa Shizuoka 436-0082 / JP | |||
03 /
Takeda, Masaomi c/o Osram-Melco Limited Kakegawa Factory 64, Tanyo Kakegawa Shizuoka 436-0082 / JP | |||
04 /
Kokufu, Koji c/o Osram-Melco Limited Kakegawa Factory 64, Tanyo Kakegawa Shizuoka 436-0082 / JP | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/03] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/37] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10003993.2 | 02.09.2003 | [2010/37] | Previously filed application, date | EP20030818559 | 02.09.2003 | [2010/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2228816 | Date: | 15.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2228816 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01J5/50, H01J5/54 | [2010/37] | CPC: |
H01J5/54 (EP,US);
F21V19/0095 (EP,US);
H01J5/50 (EP,US);
H01J5/56 (EP,US);
H01J61/327 (EP,US);
H01K3/22 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, HU, NL [2010/37] | Title | German: | Leuchtstofflampe und Sockel | [2010/37] | English: | Fluorescent lamp and base | [2010/37] | French: | Lampe fluorescente et base | [2010/37] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/17] | 25.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03818559.1 / EP1662535 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030818559) is 09.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3439137 (PATENT TREUHAND GES FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUEHLAMPEN MBH [DE]) [Y] 1,10,11,16 * page 4, line 34 - page 6, line 30 * * figure -- *; | [Y]DE19928419 (PATENT TREUHAND GES FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUEHLAMPEN MBH [DE]) [Y] 1,10,11,16 * column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 15 * * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 20 * * figure 1 *; | [A]JPH01115026 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRONICS CORP) [A] 1,16 * abstract *; | [A]JPS59128752 (CALP KOGYO KK) [A] 1,16 * figure -- * | by applicant | JPH08273602 |