EP2249174 - Help device for making fine adjustments to a laser beam on a pre-definable target [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.02.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maierhofer, Konrad Rauschbergstrasse 21 83365 Nussdorf / DE | [2010/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/45] | Representative(s) | Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Wittelsbacherstrasse 2b 82319 Starnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/14] | Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Wittelsbacherstrasse 2b 82319 Starnberg / DE | ||
Former [2010/45] | Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Wittelsbacherstrasse 5 82319 Starnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 10004237.3 | 21.04.2010 | [2010/45] | Priority number, date | DE20091019871 | 06.05.2009 Original published format: DE102009019871 | [2010/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2249174 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2249174 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2249174 | Date: | 01.04.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/497, G01S7/481, G01S17/08 | [2010/45] | CPC: |
G01S7/497 (EP);
G01S17/08 (EP);
G01S7/481 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/45] | Title | German: | Hilfsvorrichtung zur Feinjustierung eines Laserstrahls auf einen vorgebbaren Zielpunkt | [2010/45] | English: | Help device for making fine adjustments to a laser beam on a pre-definable target | [2010/45] | French: | Dispositif d'aide à l'ajustement précis d'un rayon laser sur une cible prévisible | [2010/45] | Examination procedure | 19.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/31] | 22.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.04.2010 | BG | 01.04.2015 | CY | 01.04.2015 | CZ | 01.04.2015 | DK | 01.04.2015 | EE | 01.04.2015 | ES | 01.04.2015 | FI | 01.04.2015 | HR | 01.04.2015 | IT | 01.04.2015 | LT | 01.04.2015 | LV | 01.04.2015 | MC | 01.04.2015 | MK | 01.04.2015 | MT | 01.04.2015 | NL | 01.04.2015 | PL | 01.04.2015 | RO | 01.04.2015 | SE | 01.04.2015 | SI | 01.04.2015 | SK | 01.04.2015 | SM | 01.04.2015 | TR | 01.04.2015 | AT | 21.04.2015 | IE | 21.04.2015 | LU | 21.04.2015 | BE | 30.04.2015 | CH | 30.04.2015 | LI | 30.04.2015 | NO | 01.07.2015 | GR | 02.07.2015 | IS | 01.08.2015 | PT | 03.08.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2018/02] | HU | 21.04.2010 | |
BG | 01.04.2015 | ||
CY | 01.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
MT | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SE | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
SM | 01.04.2015 | ||
TR | 01.04.2015 | ||
AT | 21.04.2015 | ||
IE | 21.04.2015 | ||
LU | 21.04.2015 | ||
BE | 30.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 21.04.2010 | |
BG | 01.04.2015 | ||
CY | 01.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
MT | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SE | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
SM | 01.04.2015 | ||
TR | 01.04.2015 | ||
AT | 21.04.2015 | ||
IE | 21.04.2015 | ||
BE | 30.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
MT | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
AT | 21.04.2015 | ||
IE | 21.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
AT | 21.04.2015 | ||
IE | 21.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
IE | 21.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
IE | 21.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/42] | NL | 01.04.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4483618 (HAMAR MARTIN R [US]) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]US2008043237 (GRIMM JIMM [US] ET AL) [A] 1-11 * abstract * |