EP2383247 - Branched hydroxyalkylpolyoxylenglycol ethers and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.04.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.05.2015 [2015/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cognis IP Management GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/44] | For all designated states Cognis IP Management GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Raths, Hans-Christian Nelly-Sachs-Strasse 13 40789 Monheim / DE | 02 /
Both, Sabine Pfarrer-Strerath-Strasse 40 41470 Neuss / DE | 03 /
Bauer, Frederic Henkelstrasse 3 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | 04 /
Weuthen, Manfred Louveciennesstrasse 33 40764 Langenfeld / DE | [2011/44] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/44] | Application number, filing date | 10004428.8 | 27.04.2010 | [2011/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2383247 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07C43/11, C11D1/72, C11D3/00 | [2011/44] | CPC: |
C07C43/11 (EP,KR,US);
C09K23/00 (EP,KR,US);
C11D1/72 (KR);
C11D3/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verzweigte Hydroxyalkylpolyoxylenglykolether und deren Verwendung | [2011/44] | English: | Branched hydroxyalkylpolyoxylenglycol ethers and their use | [2011/44] | French: | Ethers d'hydroxyalkyl-polyoxylène-glycol ramifiés et leur utilisation | [2011/44] | Examination procedure | 24.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/24] | 22.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/20] | 01.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.06.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2432757 (HENKEL & CIE GMBH); | [X]DE3345349 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) | by applicant | EP0299360 | DE19738866 | EP1229103 |