EP2253775 - Cleaning profile with reinforcement element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.08.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VWS-Befestigungstechnik GmbH Siemensstrasse 2 72805 Lichtenstein / DE | [2010/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoff, Dominique 2 rue des violettes F-57660 Grostenquin / FR | [2010/47] | Representative(s) | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Kaiserstrasse 85 72764 Reutlingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/47] | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Kaiserstrasse 85 72764 Reutlingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 10004505.3 | 29.04.2010 | [2010/47] | Priority number, date | DE20092007375U | 22.05.2009 Original published format: DE 202009007375 U | [2010/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2253775 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2253775 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | E04F13/06, E04F19/02 | [2012/36] | CPC: |
E04F13/06 (EP);
E04F13/068 (EP);
E04F19/02 (EP);
E04F2013/063 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/47] | E04F13/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Putzprofil mit Aussteifungselement | [2010/47] | English: | Cleaning profile with reinforcement element | [2010/47] | French: | Profilé d'enduction doté d'un élément de raidissement | [2010/47] | Examination procedure | 06.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/37] | 16.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1467044 (REHAU AG & CO [DE]) [X] 1-6,9 * figure 3 * * paragraph [0011] * * column 4, lines 9-16 * * column 3, lines 27-31 * [I] 7,8; | [XI]EP0473393 (EXPANDED METAL [GB]) [X] 1-8 * figure 2 * * column 1, lines 41-47 * [I] 9 | by applicant | DE19920108 |