EP2256190 - Method of diagnosing risk of myocardial infarction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.01.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.02.2012 [2012/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nagoya Industrial Science Research Institute 10-19, Sakae 2-Chome, Naka-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 460-0008 / JP | [2010/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamada, Yoshiji Glorious Midorikuhoragai 702 2-82-3, Horagai Midori-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 458-0013 / JP | 02 /
Yokota, Mitsuhiro 3-98, Kaminokura Midori-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 458-0812 / JP | [2010/48] | Representative(s) | Witthoff Jaekel Steinecke Patentanwälte PartG mbB Rechtsanwalts- und Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 1140 52412 Jülich / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/48] | Müller Fottner Steinecke Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Technologiezentrum Jülich Karl-Heinz-Beckurts-Strasse 13 52428 Jülich / DE | Application number, filing date | 10004882.6 | 20.03.2003 | [2010/48] | Priority number, date | JP20020181580 | 21.06.2002 Original published format: JP 2002181580 | [2010/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2256190 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/09, C12Q1/68, G01N33/50, G01N33/53, A61K48/00, A61P9/10 | [2010/48] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6883 (EP,KR,US);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C12N15/09 (KR);
C12Q1/6827 (KR);
G01N33/53 (KR);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Diagnose des Herzinfarktrisikos | [2010/48] | English: | Method of diagnosing risk of myocardial infarction | [2010/48] | French: | Procédé de diagnostic de risque d'infarctus du myocarde | [2010/48] | Examination procedure | 21.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/10] | 15.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/08] | 06.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/08] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03712817.0 / EP1531180 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030712817) is 08.01.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - PASTINEN T ET AL, "Array-based multiplex analysis of candidate genes reveals two independent and additive genetic risk factors for myocardial infarction in the Finnish population", HUMAN MOLECULAR GENETICS, (199809), vol. 7, no. 9, ISSN 0964-6906, pages 1453 - 1462, XP002363159 [A] 1-3 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/hmg/7.9.1453 | [A] - BRSCIC E ET AL, "Acute myocardial infarction in young adults: Prognostic role of angiotensin-converting enzyme, angiotensin II type I receptor, apolipoprotein E, endothelial constitutive nitric oxide synthase, and glycoprotein IIIa genetic polymorphisms at medium-term follow-up", AMERICAN HEART JOURNAL, MOSBY- YEAR BOOK INC., ST. LOUIS, MO, US, (200006), vol. 139, no. 6, ISSN 0002-8703, pages 979 - 984, XP002335093 [A] 1-3 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1067/mhj.2000.106165 | [A] - YE S ET AL, "PRELIMINARY REPORT: GENETIC VARIATION IN THE HUMAN STROMELYSIN PROMOTER IS ASSOCIATED WITH PROGRESSION OF CORONARY ATHEROSCLEROSIS", BRITISH HEART JOURNAL, BRITISH MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, LONDON, GB, (1995), vol. 73, no. 3, ISSN 0007-0769, pages 209 - 215, XP009054444 [A] 1-3 * abstract * | [A] - BOEKHOLDT S M ET AL, "Genetic variation in coagulation and fibrinolytic proteins and their relation with acute myocardial infarction: a systematic review.", CIRCULATION. 18 DEC 2001, (20011218), vol. 104, no. 25, ISSN 1524-4539, pages 3063 - 3068, XP002363163 [A] 1-3 * abstract * | [A] - REINER ALEXANDER P ET AL, "Coagulation factor XIII polymorphisms and the risk of myocardial infarction and ischaemic stroke in young women", BRITISH JOURNAL OF HAEMATOLOGY, (200202), vol. 116, no. 2, ISSN 0007-1048, pages 376 - 382, XP002603957 [A] 1-3 * abstract * | by applicant | - MARENBERG ME; RISCH N; BERKMAN LF; FLODERUS B; DE FAIRE U, "Genetic susceptibility to death from coronary heart disease in a study of twins", N ENGL J MED, (1994), vol. 330, pages 1041 - 1046 | - NORA JJ; LORTSCHER RH; SPANGLER RD; NORA AH; KIMBERLING WJ, "Genetic-epidemiologic study of early-onset ischemic heart disease", CIRCULATION, (1980), vol. 61, pages 503 - 508 | - BROECKEL U; HENGSTENBERG C; MAYER B ET AL., "A comprehensive linkage analysis for myocardial infarction and its related risk factors", NATURE GENET, (2002), vol. 30, doi:doi:10.1038/ng827, pages 210 - 214, XP002317848 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ng827 | - CAMBIEN F; POIRIER 0; LECERF L ET AL., "Deletion polymorphism in the gene for angiotensin-converting enzyme is a potent risk factor for myocardial infarction", NATURE, (1992), vol. 359, doi:doi:10.1038/359641a0, pages 641 - 644, XP000619624 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/359641a0 | - WEISS EJ; BRAY PF; TAYBACK M ET AL., "A polymorphism of a platelet glycoprotein receptor as an inherited risk factor for coronary thrombosis", N ENGL J MED, (1996), vol. 334, pages 1090 - 1094 | - IACOVIELLO L; DI CASTELNUOVO A; DE KNIJFF P ET AL., "Polymorphisms in the coagulation factor VII gene and the risk of myocardial infarction", N ENGL J MED, (1998), vol. 338, doi:doi:10.1056/NEJM199801083380202, pages 79 - 85, XP009054344 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJM199801083380202 | - KUIVENHOVEN JA; JUKEMA JW; ZWINDERMAN AH ET AL., "The role of a common variant of the cholesterol ester transfer protein gene in the progression of coronary atherosclerosis", N ENGL J MED, (1998), vol. 338, pages 86 - 93 | - CAMBIEN F; POIRIER O; LECERF L ET AL., "Deletion polymorphism in the gene for angiotensin-converting enzyme is a potent risk factor for myocardial infarction", NATURE, (1992), vol. 359, doi:doi:10.1038/359641a0, pages 641 - 644, XP000619624 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/359641a0 | - WEISS EJ; BRAY PF; TAYBACK M ET AL., "A genetical polymorphism of a platelet glycoprotein receptor as an inherited risk factor for coronary thrombosis", N ENGL J MED, (1996), vol. 334, pages 1090 - 1094 | - ORITA, M. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., U.S.A., (1989), vol. 86, pages 2766 - 2770 | - SAIKI, NATURE, (1986), vol. 324, pages 163 - 166 | - LIVAK, KJ, GENET ANAL, (1999), vol. 14, page 143 | - MORRIS, T. ET AL., J. CLIN. MICROBIOL., (1996), vol. 34, page 2933 | - LYAMICHEV V ET AL., NAT BIOTECHNOL, (1999), vol. 17, page 292 | - HAFF LA; SMIRNOV IP, GENOME RES, (1997), vol. 7, page 378 | - LIZARDI PM ET AL., NAT GENET, (1998), vol. 19, page 225 | - WANG DG ET AL., SCIENCE, (1998), vol. 280, page 1077 | - SOUTHERN, E., J. MOL. BIOL., (1975), vol. 98, pages 503 - 517 | - POTTER,H. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1984), vol. 81, pages 7161 - 7165 | - LAWRIE, A. ET AL., GENE THERAPY, (2000), vol. 7, pages 2023 - 2027 | - FELGNER, P.L. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1984), vol. 84, pages 7413 - 7417 | - GRAESSMANN, M.; GRAESSMANN, A., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1976), vol. 73, pages 366 - 370 | - BOERMA M; FORSBERG L; VAN ZEIJL L ET AL., "A genetic polymorphism in connexin 37 as a prognostic marker for atherosclerotic plaque development", J INTERN MED, (1999), vol. 246, doi:doi:10.1046/j.1365-2796.1999.00564.x, pages 211 - 218, XP002346533 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2796.1999.00564.x | - INOUE N; KAWASHIMA S; KANAZAWA K; YAMADA S; AKITA H; YOKOYAMA M, "Polymorphism of the NADH/NADPH oxidase p22 phox gene in patients with coronary artery disease", CIRCULATION, (1998), vol. 97, pages 135 - 137, XP002363160 | - TOPOL EJ; MCCARTHY J; GABRIEL S ET AL., "Single nucleotide polymorphisms in multiple novel thrombospondin genes may be associated with familial premature myocardial infarction", CIRCULATION, (2001), vol. 104, pages 2641 - 2644 | - SKOOG T; VAN'T HOOFT FM; KALLIN B ET AL., "A common functional polymorphism (C-A substitution at position -863) in the promoter region of the tumor necrosis factor-a (TNF-a) gene associated with reduced circulating level of TNF-a", HUM MOL GENET, (1999), vol. 8, pages 1443 - 1449 | - YAMADA Y; ICHIHARA S; FUJIMURA T; YOKOTA M, "Identification of the G994-T missense mutation in exon 9 of the plasma platelet-activating factor acetylhydrolase gene as an independent risk factor for coronary artery disease in Japanese men", METABOLISM, (1998), vol. 47, doi:doi:10.1016/S0026-0495(98)90216-5, pages 177 - 181, XP004538306 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0026-0495(98)90216-5 | - KOCH W; KASTRATI A; BOTTIGER C; MEHILLI J; VON BECKERATH N; SCHOMIG A., "Interleukin-10 and tumor necrosis factor gene polymorphisms and risk of coronary artery disease and myocardial infarction", ATHEROSCLEROSIS, (2001), vol. 159, doi:doi:10.1016/S0021-9150(01)00467-1, pages 137 - 144, XP002964779 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0021-9150(01)00467-1 | - INOUE I; NAKAJIMA T; WILLIAMS CS ET AL., "A nucleotide substitution in the promoter of human angiotensinogen is associated with essential hypertension and affects basal transcription in vitro", J CLIN INVEST, (1997), vol. 99, pages 1786 - 1797 | - LAMBERT J-C; BROUSSEAU T; DEFOSSE V ET AL., "Independent association of an APOE gene promoter polymorphism with increased risk of myocardial infarction and decreased APOE plasma concentrations-the ECTIM study", HUM MOL GENET, (2000), vol. 9, doi:doi:10.1093/hmg/9.1.57, pages 57 - 61, XP002202259 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/hmg/9.1.57 | - ETO M; WATANABE K; MAKINO I, "Increased frequency of apolipoprotein epsilon 2 and epsilon 4 alleles in patients with ischemic heart disease", CLIN GENET, (1989), vol. 36, pages 183 - 188 | - RUIZ J; BLANCHE H; JAMES RW ET AL., "Gln-Arg192 polymorphism of paraoxonase and coronary heart disease in type 2 diabetes", LANCET, (1995), vol. 346, pages 869 - 72, XP008121689 | - MURATA M; MATSUBARA Y; KAWANO K ET AL., "Coronary artery disease and polymorphisms in a receptor mediating shear stress-dependent platelet activation", CIRCULATION, (1997), vol. 96, pages 3281 - 3286 | - ERIKSSON P; KALLIN B; VAN'T HOOFT FM; BAVENHOLM P; HAMSTEN A, "Allele-specific increase in basal transcription of the plasminogen-activator inhibitor 1 gene is associated with myocardial infarction", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1995), vol. 92, pages 1851 - 1855 | - YE S; WATTS GF; MANDALIA S; HUMPHRIES SE; HENNEY AM, "Preliminary report: genetic variation in the human stromelysin promoter is associated with progression of coronary atyherosclerosis", BR HEART J, (1995), vol. 73, pages 209 - 215, XP009054444 | - MAHLEY RW, "Apolipoprotein E: cholesterol transport protein with expanding role in cell biology", SCIENCE, (1998), vol. 240, doi:doi:10.1126/science.3283935, pages 622 - 630, XP008023626 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.3283935 | - SCHNEIDER WJ; KOVANEN PT; BROWN MS ET AL., "Familial dysbetalipoproteinemia. Abnormal binding of mutant apolipoprotein E to low density lipoprotein receptors of human fibroblasts and membranes from liver and adrenal of rats, rabbits, and cows", J CLIN INVEST, (1981), vol. 68, pages 1075 - 1085 | - GREGG RE; ZECH LA; SCHAEFER EJ; BREWER HB JR, "Type III hyperlipoproteinemia: defective metabolism of an abnormal apolipoprotein E", SCIENCE, (1981), vol. 211, pages 584 - 586 | - BRESLOW JL; ZANNIS VI; SANGIACOMO TR; THIRD JL; TRACY T; GLUECK CJ, "Studies of familial type III hyperlipoproteinemia using as a genetic marker the apo E phenotype E2/2", J LIPID RES, (1982), vol. 23, pages 1224 - 1235 | - SULLIVAN PM; MEZDOUR H; QUARFORDT SH; MAEDA N, "Type III hyperlipoproteinemia and spontaneous atherosclerosis in mice resulting from gene replacement of mouse Apoe with human APOE*2", J CLIN INVEST, (1998), vol. 102, pages 130 - 135 |