12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
17.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] |
03.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
08.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] |
20.02.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.03.2015 [2015/13] |
11.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] |
28.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] |
07.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] |
07.02.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] |
24.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] |
17.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2014 [2014/08] |
22.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] |
15.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] |
08.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] |
01.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] |
25.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] |
18.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] |
09.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] |
01.03.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 03.04.2013 [2013/14] |
29.01.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
29.01.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
14.12.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
08.05.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.04.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.02.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.02.2012 |
First examination report |
|
23.11.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.11.2011 [2011/46] |
14.10.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.11.2011 [2011/46] |