EP2226030 - High-strenght microwave antenna assemblies [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2013/43] |
Former [2010/36] | For all designated states Vivant Medical, Inc. 1916A Old Middlefield Way Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Prakash, Mani 576 Virginia Avenue Cambell, CA 95008 / US | 02 /
Rossetto, Francesca 1931 Creekside Drive Longmont, CO 80504 / US | 03 /
Lee, Anthony 363 Shelby Drive Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 04 /
Kim, Steven 1101 Seena Avenue Los Altos CA 94024 / US | 05 /
Su, Ted 14032 Caminito Vistana San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 06 /
Glassman, Jonathan 6870 Fox Lake Court Indianapolis, IN 46278 / US | [2010/50] |
Former [2010/36] | 01 /
Prakash, Mani 576 Virginia Avenue Cambell, CA 95008 / US | ||
02 /
Rossetto, Francesca 8 Locksley Avenue, Apt. 9B San Francisco, CA 94122 / US | |||
03 /
Lee, Anthony 363 Shelby Drive Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | |||
04 /
Kim, Steven 1256 Roycott Way San Jose, CA 95125 / US | |||
05 /
Su, Ted 14032 Caminito Vistana San Diego, CA 92130 / US | |||
06 /
Glassman, Jonathan 6870 Fox Lake Court Indianapolis, IN 46278 / US | Representative(s) | Price, Nigel John King J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [2012/49] |
Former [2010/36] | Price, Nigel John King J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10004950.1 | 29.10.2002 | [2010/36] | Priority number, date | US20010052848 | 02.11.2001 Original published format: US 52848 | US20020272058 | 15.10.2002 Original published format: US 272058 | [2010/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2226030 | Date: | 08.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2226030 | Date: | 05.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/18, A61N5/04, A61B18/12 | [2010/36] | CPC: |
A61B18/12 (EP,US);
A61B18/18 (EP,US);
A61B18/1815 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00601 (EP,US);
A61B2018/124 (EP,US);
A61B2018/128 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2010/36] | Title | German: | Hochfeste Mikrowellenantennenanordnungen | [2010/36] | English: | High-strenght microwave antenna assemblies | [2010/36] | French: | Ensembles d'antenne à micro-ondes haute résistance | [2010/36] | Examination procedure | 08.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/16] | 30.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02786604.5 / EP1450710 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020786604) is 30.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.12.2012 | BE | 05.12.2012 | CY | 05.12.2012 | CZ | 05.12.2012 | DK | 05.12.2012 | EE | 05.12.2012 | FI | 05.12.2012 | IT | 05.12.2012 | MC | 05.12.2012 | NL | 05.12.2012 | SE | 05.12.2012 | SK | 05.12.2012 | TR | 05.12.2012 | BG | 05.03.2013 | GR | 06.03.2013 | ES | 16.03.2013 | PT | 05.04.2013 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/25] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
IT | 05.12.2012 | ||
MC | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
IT | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | SE | 05.12.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4557272 (CARR KENNETH L [US]) [A] 1 * Title * * figure 9 ** column 16, line 12 - column 17, line 33 *; | [A]US5275597 (HIGGINS SHERYL W [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 11, line 3 - line 43; figures 8-12 *; | [A]US5301687 (WONG TERENCE Z [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 51 - line 62; figure 3 *; | [X]WO9518575 (VIDAMED INC [US]) [X] 1 * page 17, line 8 - page 5; figure 16 *; | [A]WO9844968 (SONIQUE SURGICAL SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1 * page 7, line 10 - line 27; figures 1,2 * * page 3, line 21 - line 23 * * page 8, line 8 - line 12 * * page 5, line 9 - line 15 *; | [A]US6277113 (BERUBE DANY [US]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 1 - line 13 * * figure 4 * * column 8, line 23 - column 10, line 18; figure 4 * | Examination | US5221281 | US5437662 | WO9942047 |