EP2256508 - Test procedure and assemblies for measuring partial discharges in a discharger sea cable splice [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.02.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NKT GmbH & Co. KG Düsseldorfer Strasse 400 Im Chempark 51061 Köln / DE | [2018/07] |
Former [2015/01] | For all designated states nkt cables GmbH & Co. KG Düsseldorfer Strasse 400 Im Chempark 51061 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2014/13] | For all designated states nkt cables GmbH Düsseldorfer Strasse 400 51061 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2010/48] | For all designated states nkt cables GmbH Schanzenstrasse 6-20 51063 Köln / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Amerpohl, Uwe Bachstrasse 20 51467 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 02 /
Comanns, Rudolf Saarhofweg 25 41199 Mönchengladbach / DE | 03 /
Kujat, Swetlana Schützenstrasse 52 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | 04 /
Haase, Michael Finkenweg 3 51381 Leverkusen / DE | [2017/13] |
Former [2010/48] | 01 /
Amerpohl, Uwe Bachstr. 20 51467 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
02 /
Comanns, Rudolf Saarhofweg 25 41199 Mönchengladbach / DE | |||
03 /
Kujat, Swetlana Schützenstr.52 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
04 /
Haase, Michael Finkenweg 3 51381 Leverkusen / DE | Representative(s) | Feder Walter Ebert Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten mbB Achenbachstrasse 59 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/29] | Feder Walter Ebert Patentanwälte Achenbachstrasse 59 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 10005093.9 | 14.05.2010 | [2010/48] | Priority number, date | DE20091022705 | 26.05.2009 Original published format: DE102009022705 | DE20091043339 | 28.09.2009 Original published format: DE102009043339 | [2010/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2256508 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2256508 | Date: | 24.05.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2256508 | Date: | 18.07.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/02 | [2010/48] | CPC: |
G01R31/58 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/51] |
Former [2010/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Prüfverfahren und Anordnungen zur Messung von Teilentladungen an einem Einleiterseekabelspleiß | [2010/48] | English: | Test procedure and assemblies for measuring partial discharges in a discharger sea cable splice | [2010/48] | French: | Procédé de contrôle et dispositifs destinés à mesurer des décharges partielles sur une épissure de câble sous-marin à conducteur | [2010/48] | Examination procedure | 14.05.2010 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.11.2017 | Examination requested [2017/51] | 27.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.02.2018 | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.05.2010 | AL | 18.07.2018 | CY | 18.07.2018 | CZ | 18.07.2018 | EE | 18.07.2018 | ES | 18.07.2018 | HR | 18.07.2018 | LT | 18.07.2018 | LV | 18.07.2018 | MC | 18.07.2018 | MK | 18.07.2018 | MT | 18.07.2018 | RO | 18.07.2018 | SI | 18.07.2018 | SK | 18.07.2018 | SM | 18.07.2018 | TR | 18.07.2018 | BG | 18.10.2018 | IS | 18.11.2018 | PT | 18.11.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 14.05.2010 | |
AL | 18.07.2018 | ||
CY | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
MT | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
TR | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
PT | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 14.05.2010 | |
AL | 18.07.2018 | ||
CY | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
TR | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
PT | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
CY | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
TR | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
PT | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
TR | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
PT | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
TR | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | LT | 18.07.2018 | |
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 18.07.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE3822288 (FELTEN & GUILLEAUME ENERGIE [DE]) [AD] 1-5 * abstract * * column 1, lines 7-62 * * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 8 *; | [AD]DE4009243 (RHEYDT KABELWERK AG [DE]) [AD] 1-5 * abstract * * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 44 *; | [A]JPH085700 (FUJIKURA LTD) [A] 1-5 * abstract ** paragraphs [0006] - [0012] - [0015] - [0018] *; | [AD]WO0042444 (BICC GEN UK CABLES LTD [GB], et al) [AD] 1-5 * abstract * * page 1, line 27 - page 2, line 9 * * page 4, lines 1-29 * | by applicant | DE3822288 | DE4009243 | EP0806676 | WO0042444 |