EP2221248 - System for loading and unloading unit load into a cargo hold, in particular of an aircraft, and intermediate transport device or corresponding transport unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, CY, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telair International AB Porfyrvägen 14 224 78 Lund / SE | [2010/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Helmner, Anders Näktergalsvägen 19 23734 Bjärred / SE | [2010/34] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/34] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2010/34] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 10005302.4 | 11.03.2003 | [2010/34] | Priority number, date | DE2002110575 | 11.03.2002 Original published format: DE 10210575 | DE2002212383U | 11.03.2002 Original published format: DE 20212383 U | DE2002138249 | 21.08.2002 Original published format: DE 10238249 | [2010/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2221248 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2221248 | Date: | 01.09.2010 | [2010/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2221248 | Date: | 20.08.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B64F1/32 | [2014/10] | CPC: |
B65G67/08 (EP,US);
B64D9/00 (EP,US);
B64F1/32 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/34] | B64D9/00, B65G67/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/34] | Extension states | LT | 20.05.2010 | LV | 20.05.2010 | Title | German: | System zum Be- und Entladen von Stückgut in einem Laderaum, insbesondere eines Flugzeugs, sowie Zwischenfördereinrichtung hierfür | [2010/34] | English: | System for loading and unloading unit load into a cargo hold, in particular of an aircraft, and intermediate transport device or corresponding transport unit | [2010/34] | French: | Système de chargement et de déchargement de marchandises de détail dans un espace de chargement, en particulier d'une cale d'avion, et système de transport intermédiaire ou unité de transport correspondante | [2014/14] |
Former [2010/34] | Système de chargement et de déchargement de marchandises de détail dans un espace de chargement, en particulier d'une cale d'avion, et système de transport intermédiaire ou unité de transport correspondante. | Examination procedure | 20.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/44] | 12.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03724913.3 / EP1483150 | EP06026625.1 / EP1759990 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030724913) is 14.12.2004 | Opposition(s) | 21.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.03.2003 | CY | 20.08.2014 | CZ | 20.08.2014 | EE | 20.08.2014 | FI | 20.08.2014 | IT | 20.08.2014 | MC | 20.08.2014 | RO | 20.08.2014 | SI | 20.08.2014 | SK | 20.08.2014 | TR | 20.08.2014 | BG | 20.11.2014 | GR | 21.11.2014 | PT | 22.12.2014 | AT | 11.03.2015 | IE | 11.03.2015 | LU | 11.03.2015 | BE | 31.03.2015 | CH | 31.03.2015 | LI | 31.03.2015 | [2017/40] |
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 20.08.2014 | |
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
AT | 11.03.2015 | ||
IE | 11.03.2015 | ||
LU | 11.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CZ | 20.08.2014 | |
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
IE | 11.03.2015 | ||
LU | 11.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | CZ | 20.08.2014 | |
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
LU | 11.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 20.08.2014 | |
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
LU | 11.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | CZ | 20.08.2014 | |
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
LU | 11.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CZ | 20.08.2014 | |
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CZ | 20.08.2014 | |
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | FI | 20.08.2014 | |
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | FI | 20.08.2014 | |
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 20.08.2014 | |
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 20.08.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO0151356 (SCANDINAVIAN AIRLINES SYSTEM [DK], et al) [X] 1-13 * the whole document * [A] 14; | [XA]DE19719748 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,6,8,10-13 * page 7, line 63 - page 8, line 9; figure -; claim 12 * [A] 14; | [XA]US5538391 (BONNET HENRI [US]) [X] 1,2,5,6,8,10-13 * page 5, lines 52-63; figure - * [A] 14; | [XA]WO0144049 (SCHOPF MASCHB GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,5,6,8,10-13 * the whole document * [A] 14; | [XA]DE29721959U (FRANKE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,6,8,10,11,13 * figure - * [A] 14; | [A]DE4238095 (SCANDINAVIAN BELLYLOADING [SE]) [A] 14 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE19961349 | DE29721959U | WO9854073 | DE10007332 | DE4238095 | WO0151356 |