EP2267200 - Procedure for operating a workstation and workstation of an open ended rotor spinning machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2013 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oerlikon Textile GmbH & Co. KG Leverkuser Strasse 65 42897 Remscheid / DE | [2010/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Abu-Amna, Omar Abu Mohamed Viktoriastraße 78 52066 Aachen / DE | [2010/52] | Representative(s) | Hamann, Arndt, et al Oerlikon Textile GmbH & Co. KG Abteilung DS Carlstrasse 60 52531 Übach-Palenberg / DE | [2012/35] |
Former [2010/52] | Hamann, Arndt, et al Oerlikon Textile GmbH & Co. KG Carlstrasse 60 52531 Übach-Palenberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 10005340.4 | 21.05.2010 | [2010/52] | Priority number, date | DE20091030677 | 26.06.2009 Original published format: DE102009030677 | [2010/52] | Previously filed application, date | DE20091030677 | 26.06.2009 | [2010/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2267200 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2267200 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | D01H4/50 | [2010/52] | CPC: |
D01H4/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/52] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Betreiben einer Arbeitsstelle und Arbeitsstelle einer Offenend-Rotorspinnmaschine | [2010/52] | English: | Procedure for operating a workstation and workstation of an open ended rotor spinning machine | [2010/52] | French: | Procédé de fonctionnement d'un poste de travail et poste de travail d'un métier à tisser à rotor à extrémité ouverte | [2010/52] | Examination procedure | 07.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/32] | 26.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.05.2010 | AL | 29.08.2012 | CY | 29.08.2012 | DK | 29.08.2012 | EE | 29.08.2012 | FI | 29.08.2012 | HR | 29.08.2012 | LT | 29.08.2012 | LV | 29.08.2012 | MC | 29.08.2012 | MK | 29.08.2012 | MT | 29.08.2012 | NL | 29.08.2012 | PL | 29.08.2012 | RO | 29.08.2012 | SE | 29.08.2012 | SI | 29.08.2012 | SK | 29.08.2012 | SM | 29.08.2012 | TR | 29.08.2012 | BG | 29.11.2012 | NO | 29.11.2012 | GR | 30.11.2012 | ES | 10.12.2012 | IS | 29.12.2012 | PT | 31.12.2012 | IE | 21.05.2013 | LU | 21.05.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 21.05.2010 | |
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
MC | 29.08.2012 | ||
MK | 29.08.2012 | ||
MT | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
SM | 29.08.2012 | ||
TR | 29.08.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
IE | 21.05.2013 | ||
LU | 21.05.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 29.08.2012 | |
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
MC | 29.08.2012 | ||
MK | 29.08.2012 | ||
MT | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
SM | 29.08.2012 | ||
TR | 29.08.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
IE | 21.05.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 29.08.2012 | |
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
MC | 29.08.2012 | ||
MT | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
SM | 29.08.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
IE | 21.05.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | CY | 29.08.2012 | |
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
MC | 29.08.2012 | ||
MT | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
IE | 21.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 29.08.2012 | |
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
MC | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
IE | 21.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | CY | 29.08.2012 | |
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
MC | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 29.08.2012 | |
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | DK | 29.08.2012 | |
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | DK | 29.08.2012 | |
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | DK | 29.08.2012 | |
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | DK | 29.08.2012 | |
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | FI | 29.08.2012 | |
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | FI | 29.08.2012 | |
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | FI | 29.08.2012 | |
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | FI | 29.08.2012 | |
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 29.08.2012 | |
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 29.08.2012 | |
NO | 29.11.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]DE102007056561 (OERLIKON TEXTILE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [I] 1-7 * paragraphs [0027] , [0 32] - [0034]; figure 1; claim 4 *; | [A]DE102007038871 (RIETER INGOLSTADT SPINNEREI [DE]) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0048]; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | DE10139072 |