EP2216687 - Dynamic end seal for image forming apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.09.2015 [2015/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lexmark International, Inc. 740 West New Circle Road Lexington, Kentucky 40550 / US | [2014/43] |
Former [2010/32] | For all designated states Lexmark International, Inc. 740 West New Circle Road Lexington, Kentucky 40550 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Korfhage, Kurt Matthew 501 Matterhorn Drive Shelbyville, KY 40065 / US | 02 /
Maul, Michael, David 1377 Copperfield Court Lexington, KY 40514 / US | 03 /
Meade, Alexander, Douglas 103 Irvine Road Lexington, KY 40502 / US | 04 /
Stickler, Tom, E. 257 Old Ashley Loop Pawleys Island South Carolina 29585 / US | 05 /
Wang, Liqun, Larry 1108 Benjamin Lane Lexington, KY 40513 / US | [2014/43] |
Former [2010/48] | 01 /
Korfhage, Kurt Matthew 501 Matterhorn Drive Shelbyville, KY 40065 / US | ||
02 /
Maul, Michael, David 1377 Copperfield Court Lexington, KY 40514 / US | |||
03 /
Meade, Alexander, Douglas 103 Irvine Road Lexington, KY 40502 / US | |||
04 /
Stickler, Tom, E. 257 Old Ashley Loop Pawleys Island South Carolina 29585 / US | |||
05 /
Wang, Liqun, Larry 1108 Benjamin Lane Lexington, KY 40513 / US | |||
Former [2010/35] | 01 /
Korfhage, Kurt Matthew 501 Matterhorn Drive Shelbyville, KY 40065 / US | ||
02 /
Maul, Michael, David 713 Troy Trail Lexington, KY 40517 / US | |||
03 /
Meade, Alexander, Douglas 103 Irvine Road Lexington, KY 40502 / US | |||
04 /
Stickler, Tom, E. 416 Dudley Road Lexington, KY 40502 / US | |||
05 /
Wang, Liqun, Larry 1108 Benjamin Lane Lexington, KY 40513 / US | Representative(s) | Börner, Robert, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [2014/42] |
Former [2014/27] | McIlroy, Steven David, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2010/32] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 10005430.3 | 18.09.2002 | [2010/32] | Priority number, date | US20010965266 | 27.09.2001 Original published format: US 965266 | [2010/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2216687 | Date: | 11.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2216687 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/08 | [2010/32] | CPC: |
G03G21/0011 (EP,US);
G03G21/10 (KR);
G03G21/007 (EP,US);
G03G2215/1661 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/32] | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHE ENDDICHTUNG FÜR EINE BILDERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2014/12] | English: | Dynamic end seal for image forming apparatus | [2010/32] | French: | EMBOUT PROTECTEUR DYNAMIQUE POUR APPAREIL DE FORMATION D'IMAGES | [2014/12] |
Former [2010/32] | Dynamische Enddichtung für eine Bilderzeugungsvorrichtung | ||
Former [2010/32] | Embout protecteur dynamique pour appareil de formation d'images | Examination procedure | 03.08.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/13] | 11.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02761699.4 / EP1438638 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020761699) is 25.01.2010 | Opposition(s) | 23.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4211484 (IWAI FUMIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 3, line 9 - column 4, line 9 * * figures 3,4 *; | [A]US4616919 (ADLEY JAMES M [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 4, line 34 - column 5, line 36 * * figures 3-6 *; | [A]US3809012 (DELVECCHIO G) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [AP]US6341206 (YAMAGUCHI NAOKI [JP], et al) [AP] 1-5 * the whole document * | by applicant | US6487383 |