EP2390676 - Electromagnetic coil structure having a flat conductive track, magnetic core and magneto electronic angle sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tyco Electronics Belgium EC BVBA Siemenslaan 14 8020 Oostkamp / BE | [2011/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ocket, Tom Kortemarkstraat 23 8820 Torhout / BE | 02 /
Mertens, Guus Keiberg 43 9230 Massemen / BE | 03 /
Van Tomme, Marc Kortrijkesestraat 29 8800 Roselare / BE | 04 /
van Cauwenberge, Jan Riethuulstraat 5 9880 Aalter / BE | [2015/46] |
Former [2011/48] | 01 /
Ocket, Tom Kortemarkstraat 23 8820 Torhout / BE | ||
02 /
Mertens, Guus Keiberg 43 9230 Massemen / BE | |||
03 /
Van Tomme, Marc Kortrijkesestraat 29 8800 Roselare / BE | |||
04 /
Van Cauwenberge, Jan Riethuulstraat 5 9880 Aalter / BE | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2015/46] |
Former [2011/48] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10005569.8 | 28.05.2010 | [2011/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2390676 | Date: | 30.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2390676 | Date: | 11.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/20 | [2013/37] | CPC: |
G01B7/30 (EP,US);
G01D5/2086 (EP,US);
G01R3/00 (US);
G01R33/04 (KR);
H02K3/18 (US);
Y10T29/49073 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/48] | G01R33/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/46] |
Former [2011/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Elektromagnetische Spulenstruktur mit einer ebenen leitfähigen Spur, Magnetkern und magnetoelektronischer Winkelsensor | [2011/48] | English: | Electromagnetic coil structure having a flat conductive track, magnetic core and magneto electronic angle sensor | [2011/48] | French: | Structure de bobine électromagnétique dotée d'une piste conductrice plate, noyau magnétique et capteur d'angle magnéto-électronique | [2011/48] | Examination procedure | 30.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/29] | 16.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.04.2014 | Opposition(s) | 12.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.05.2010 | AL | 11.11.2015 | AT | 11.11.2015 | BE | 11.11.2015 | BG | 11.11.2015 | CY | 11.11.2015 | CZ | 11.11.2015 | DK | 11.11.2015 | EE | 11.11.2015 | ES | 11.11.2015 | FI | 11.11.2015 | HR | 11.11.2015 | IT | 11.11.2015 | LT | 11.11.2015 | LV | 11.11.2015 | MC | 11.11.2015 | MK | 11.11.2015 | NL | 11.11.2015 | PL | 11.11.2015 | RO | 11.11.2015 | SE | 11.11.2015 | SI | 11.11.2015 | SK | 11.11.2015 | SM | 11.11.2015 | TR | 11.11.2015 | NO | 11.02.2016 | GR | 12.02.2016 | IS | 11.03.2016 | PT | 11.03.2016 | GB | 28.05.2016 | IE | 28.05.2016 | LU | 28.05.2016 | CH | 31.05.2016 | LI | 31.05.2016 | MT | 31.05.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 28.05.2010 | |
AT | 11.11.2015 | ||
BE | 11.11.2015 | ||
BG | 11.11.2015 | ||
CY | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
MK | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
TR | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
GB | 28.05.2016 | ||
IE | 28.05.2016 | ||
LU | 28.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
MT | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 28.05.2010 | |
AT | 11.11.2015 | ||
BE | 11.11.2015 | ||
CY | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
MK | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
TR | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
GB | 28.05.2016 | ||
IE | 28.05.2016 | ||
LU | 28.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
MT | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 28.05.2010 | |
AT | 11.11.2015 | ||
BE | 11.11.2015 | ||
CY | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
MK | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
TR | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
GB | 28.05.2016 | ||
IE | 28.05.2016 | ||
LU | 28.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 28.05.2010 | |
AT | 11.11.2015 | ||
BE | 11.11.2015 | ||
CY | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
MK | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
GB | 28.05.2016 | ||
IE | 28.05.2016 | ||
LU | 28.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
BE | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
GB | 28.05.2016 | ||
IE | 28.05.2016 | ||
LU | 28.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
BE | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
LU | 28.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
BE | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
LU | 28.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
BE | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 11.11.2015 | |
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 11.11.2015 | |
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 11.11.2015 | |
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 11.11.2015 | |
LT | 11.11.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2008089305 (HITACHI CABLE) [X] 1-20 * abstract *; | [AD]US5300884 (MAESTRE JEAN-FRANCOIS [FR]) [AD] 1-20 * figures 1,3,6,7; claims 1,3 * | Examination | DE4233086 | GB2272110 | by applicant | US5300884 | DE20101004887 | DE20091021444 |