EP2223984 - Press-on twist-off closure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/35] | Method for making a container seal | ||
[2010/42] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2021 | Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect published | published on 27.10.2021 [2021/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ACTEGA DS GmbH Straubingerstrasse 12 28219 Bremen / DE | [2010/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Poel-Asendorf, Christiane Sudweyher Straße 61 28844 Weyhe / DE | 02 /
Wittenberg, Rüdiger Katrepeler Straße 20 28215 Bremen / DE | 03 /
Schlenk, Georg Weißdornweg 8 27793 Wildeshausen / DE | [2010/35] | Representative(s) | Maiwald, Walter Gottschalk Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwalts- (Schweiz) GmbH Florastrasse 14 8008 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2017/49] | Maiwald, Walter Gottschalk Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwalts- (Schweiz) GmbH Splügenstrasse 8 8002 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2015/02] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/35] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10006004.5 | 07.11.2008 | [2010/35] | Priority number, date | EP20070021782 | 09.11.2007 Original published format: EP 07021782 | EP20080002379 | 08.02.2008 Original published format: EP 08002379 | [2010/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2223984 | Date: | 01.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2223984 | Date: | 06.12.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C09K3/10, B65D41/04, B65D43/02, C08L23/08 | [2010/35] | CPC: |
B65D41/045 (EP,US);
B29C43/184 (US);
B29D99/0096 (US);
B65D41/0485 (EP,US);
C08L23/0815 (EP,US);
C09K3/10 (EP,US);
B29K2101/00 (US);
B29L2031/712 (US);
B29L2031/7158 (US);
C08K2201/008 (EP,US);
C08K5/0008 (EP,US);
C08L53/02 (EP,US);
C09K2200/0447 (EP,US);
C09K2200/047 (EP,US);
C09K2200/0617 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L23/0815, C08L2666/06 (US,EP);
C08L23/0815, C08L2666/24 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/49] |
Former [2010/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 10.06.2010 | BA | 10.06.2010 | MK | 10.06.2010 | RS | 10.06.2010 | Title | German: | Press-on twist-off Gefäßverschluss | [2014/26] | English: | Press-on twist-off closure | [2014/26] | French: | Fermeture Press-on twist-off | [2014/26] |
Former [2010/35] | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Gefäßverschlusses | ||
Former [2010/35] | Method for making a container seal | ||
Former [2010/35] | Pièce intercalaire comme élément d'un positionneur analogique | Examination procedure | 10.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/35] | 01.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 14.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08848153.6 / EP2209722 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080848153) is 25.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.12.2017
07.03.2019
WITHDRAWN Silgan White Cap Manufacturing GmbH Hansastrasse 4 30419 Hannover / DE Opponent's representative Leonhard, Frank Reimund Leonhard & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 09 62 80083 München / DE | 02
05.09.2018
18.09.2018
WITHDRAWN Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 57 40589 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [2021/26] |
Former [2019/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.12.2017
07.03.2019
WITHDRAWN Silgan White Cap Manufacturing GmbH Hansastrasse 4 30419 Hannover / DE Opponent's representative Leonhard, Frank Reimund Leonhard & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 09 62 80083 München / DE | ||
02
05.09.2018
18.09.2018
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 57 40589 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | |||
Former [2018/43] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.12.2017
26.06.2018
ADMISSIBLE Silgan White Cap Manufacturing GmbH Hansastrasse 4 30419 Hannover / DE Opponent's representative Leonhard, Frank Reimund Leonhard & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 09 62 80083 München / DE | ||
02
05.09.2018
18.09.2018
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 57 40589 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | |||
Former [2018/03] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.12.2017
WITHDRAWN Silgan White Cap Manufacturing GmbH Hansastrasse 4 30419 Hannover / DE Opponent's representative Leonhard, Frank Reimund Leonhard & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 09 62 80083 München / DE | 25.09.2018 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 25.01.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.01.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.01.2020 | 29.01.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.09.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.11.2020 | 30.11.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.06.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.11.2021 | 14.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 24.06.2021 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2021/43] | 16.11.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   17.02.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 23.12.2014 | Stay of proceedings | [2015/10] | 01.09.2016 | Resumption of proceedings | [2016/31] | 23.12.2014 | Stay of proceedings | [2016/31] | 02.10.2017 | Resumption of proceedings | [2017/34] | 23.12.2014 | Stay of proceedings | [2017/34] | 23.12.2014 | Stay of proceedings | [2016/48] | 23.12.2014 | Stay of proceedings | [2016/23] | 01.08.2016 | Resumption of proceedings | [2016/23] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.11.2008 | CY | 06.12.2017 | CZ | 06.12.2017 | EE | 06.12.2017 | FI | 06.12.2017 | GR | 06.12.2017 | HR | 06.12.2017 | LT | 06.12.2017 | LV | 06.12.2017 | MC | 06.12.2017 | MT | 06.12.2017 | PT | 06.12.2017 | RO | 06.12.2017 | SI | 06.12.2017 | SK | 06.12.2017 | BG | 06.03.2018 | NO | 06.03.2018 | IS | 06.04.2018 | IE | 07.11.2018 | LU | 07.11.2018 | BE | 30.11.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/32] | HU | 07.11.2008 | |
CY | 06.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
MT | 06.12.2017 | ||
PT | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
IS | 06.04.2018 | ||
IE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 07.11.2008 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
MT | 06.12.2017 | ||
PT | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
IE | 07.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | CZ | 06.12.2017 | |
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
MT | 06.12.2017 | ||
PT | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
IE | 07.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | CZ | 06.12.2017 | |
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
MT | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
IE | 07.11.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 06.12.2017 | |
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
MT | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | CZ | 06.12.2017 | |
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
MT | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 06.12.2017 | |
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MT | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/42] | CZ | 06.12.2017 | |
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CZ | 06.12.2017 | |
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/27] | FI | 06.12.2017 | |
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | FI | 06.12.2017 | |
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1782737 (GRACE W R & CO) [X] 1-5,9-12 * page 1, paragraphs 1-2; examples 1-2 *; | [XDI]EP0503124 (DS CHEMIE GMBH [DE]) [XD] 11,12 * page 2, lines 1-6 * * page 4, lines 9-15 * * page 5, lines 34-38; example 1 *[I] 1-4,6,9,10; | [X]WO9505427 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [X] 1-12 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [0008] - [0011] - [0025] - [0026] - [0029] - [0031] *; | [X]WO9620878 (ALCOA CLOSURE SYSTEMS INT INC [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 34 * * page 3, lines 6-14 * * page 4, line 15 - page 5, line 32 * * page 9, lines 17-21; figure 1; example - *; | [X]US6235822 (WHETTEN ALAN R [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * column 1, lines 21-45 * * column 5, line 37 - column 6, line 47 * * column 8, line 63 - column 9, line 24 * * column 11, line 8 - column 16, line 15; example 1 * | Examination | US2006199911 | by applicant | EP0714426 | US5763004 | EP0503124 | Opposition | US4085186 | US4256234 | WO9425526 | DE4329948 | WO9620878 | US5686040 | EP0714426 | US6056136 | JP2000301561 | US6235822 | JP2001261054 | EP1306405 | JP2004292651 | US2006199911 | JP2007091770 | WO2009059788 | US3270904 | US4743636 | EP0217252 | WO2006113000 | - The Dow Chemical Company, "Unique Material Properties and Potential Applications of Novel Olefin Block Copolymers", Technical Paper presented at ANTEC 2006, (20060500), pages 1 - 12, XP055121772 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/http://msdssearch.dow.com/PublishedLiteratureDOWCOM/dh_004a/0901b8038004aeec.pdf?filepath=infuse/pdfs/noreg/788-00401.pdf&fromPage=GetDoc | - IUPAC, Compendium o Chemical Terminology Gold Book version 2.3.3, (20140224), pages 335 - 336, XP055443608 | - The Dow Chemical Company, "Versify Plastomers and Elastomers. Specialty Propylene-Ethylene Copolymers", Product Contributions by Application, (20070300), pages 1 - 3, XP055443647 | - "Shore a hardness tester", Metrex Instruments, www.metrexinstruments.com/shore-a-hardness-tester.html | - "Polyethylen", Wikipedia, (20071101), pages 1 - 5, URL: https://de.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Polyethylen&oldid=38477108, XP055443109 | - "Structure and properties of single site", GEORGE M. BENEDIKT et al., Metallocene-Catalyzed Polymers - Materials, Properties, Processing & Markets, PDL, (19980000), pages i-viii,114 - 126, XP055443643 | - J. AHMED et al., "Changes in colour during high pressure processing offruits and vegetables", Stewart Postharvest Review, (20060000), vol. 5, no. 9, pages 1 - 8, XP055443624 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2212/spr.2006.5.9 | - Anonymous, "DUROMETER Conversion Chart", Mechanical Rubber, URL: https://mechanicalrubber.com/elastomericsolutions/wp- content/uploads/2014/06/Durometer-Conversion-Table-with-watermark.pdf, XP 055447571 | - Sales Rep, "General Properties of Rubber Elastomers", Mechanical Rubber, URL: https://mechanicalrubber.com/elastomericsolutions/wp- content/uploads/2014/02/Property-Guide-w-logo-watermark.pdf, XP055521070 |