Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014022878 | Global Dossier | 23.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2007271698 | 18.10.2007 | US201213456089 | 25.04.2012 | US201314035823 | 24.09.2013 | JP2007147462 | 01.06.2007 | US45100609 | 22.10.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8582412 | Global Dossier | 12.11.2013 | B2 | US2012207009 | 16.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008JP60056 | 30.05.2008 | JP2007271698 | 18.10.2007 | US201213456089 | 25.04.2012 | JP2007147462 | 01.06.2007 | US45100609 | 22.10.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8441905 | Global Dossier | 14.05.2013 | B2 | US2010254246 | 07.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008JP60056 | 30.05.2008 | JP2007271698 | 18.10.2007 | US80148910 | 11.06.2010 | JP2007147462 | 01.06.2007 | US45100609 | 22.10.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010254245 | Global Dossier | 07.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008JP60056 | 30.05.2008 | JP2007271698 | 18.10.2007 | US80148810 | 11.06.2010 | JP2007147462 | 01.06.2007 | US45100609 | 22.10.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010254244 | Global Dossier | 07.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008JP60056 | 30.05.2008 | JP2007271698 | 18.10.2007 | US80148710 | 11.06.2010 | JP2007147462 | 01.06.2007 | US45100609 | 22.10.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010254243 | Global Dossier | 07.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008JP60056 | 30.05.2008 | JP2007271698 | 18.10.2007 | JP2007147462 | 01.06.2007 | US80148510 | 11.06.2010 | US45100609 | 22.10.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010254234 | Global Dossier | 07.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008JP60056 | 30.05.2008 | JP2007271698 | 18.10.2007 | US80148610 | 11.06.2010 | JP2007147462 | 01.06.2007 | US45100609 | 22.10.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8189444 | Global Dossier | 29.05.2012 | B2 | US2010046333 | 25.02.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008JP60056 | 30.05.2008 | JP2007271698 | 18.10.2007 | JP2007147462 | 01.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4938078B | Global Dossier | 23.05.2012 | B2 | JPWO2008149814 | 26.08.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008JP60056 | 30.05.2008 | JP2007271698 | 18.10.2007 | JP2007147462 | 01.06.2007 | JP2009517848 | 30.05.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5422009B | Global Dossier | 19.02.2014 | B2 | JP2012123903 | 28.06.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2007271698 | 18.10.2007 | JP2012036772 | 22.02.2012 | JP2007147462 | 01.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4938111B | Global Dossier | 23.05.2012 | B2 | JP2010225282 | 07.10.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2010134359 | 11.06.2010 | JP2007271698 | 18.10.2007 | JP2007147462 | 01.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4938110B | Global Dossier | 23.05.2012 | B2 | JP2010225281 | 07.10.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2010134358 | 11.06.2010 | JP2007271698 | 18.10.2007 | JP2007147462 | 01.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4938109B | Global Dossier | 23.05.2012 | B2 | JP2010225280 | 07.10.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2010134357 | 11.06.2010 | JP2007271698 | 18.10.2007 | JP2007147462 | 01.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4938108B | Global Dossier | 23.05.2012 | B2 | JP2010225279 | 07.10.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2007271698 | 18.10.2007 | JP2007147462 | 01.06.2007 | JP2010134356 | 11.06.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4938107B | Global Dossier | 23.05.2012 | B2 | JP2010225278 | 07.10.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2007271698 | 18.10.2007 | JP2007147462 | 01.06.2007 | JP2010134355 | 11.06.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2251865 | Global Dossier | 22.12.2010 | A3 | EP2251865 | 17.11.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP08764924 | 30.05.2008 | JP2007271698 | 18.10.2007 | JP2007147462 | 01.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2251864 | Global Dossier | 22.12.2010 | A3 | EP2251864 | 17.11.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP08764924 | 30.05.2008 | JP2007271698 | 18.10.2007 | JP2007147462 | 01.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2249339 | Global Dossier | 22.12.2010 | A3 | EP2249339 | 10.11.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP08764924 | 30.05.2008 | JP2007271698 | 18.10.2007 | JP2007147462 | 01.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2249338 | Global Dossier | 22.12.2010 | A3 | EP2249338 | 10.11.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP08764924 | 30.05.2008 | JP2007271698 | 18.10.2007 | JP2007147462 | 01.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2175447 | Global Dossier | 19.01.2011 | A4 | EP2175447 | 14.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008JP60056 | 30.05.2008 | JP2007271698 | 18.10.2007 | JP2007147462 | 01.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2251863 | Global Dossier | 22.12.2010 | A3 | EP2251863 | 17.11.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP08764924 | 30.05.2008 | JP2007271698 | 18.10.2007 | JP2007147462 | 01.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008149814 | Global Dossier | 11.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2007271698 | 18.10.2007 | JP2007147462 | 01.06.2007 | Type | Earlier application | EP2175447 |