12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
22.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] |
15.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
08.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
10.06.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] |
29.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] |
18.03.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.04.2016 [2016/16] |
17.04.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] |
23.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.02.2015 [2015/09] |
05.09.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.10.2014 [2014/41] |
15.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] |
01.08.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] |
06.06.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.07.2014 [2014/28] |
23.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.06.2014 [2014/26] |
09.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] |
02.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] |
25.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.05.2014 [2014/22] |
28.03.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.04.2014 [2014/18] |
14.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.03.2014 [2014/12] |
24.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] |
17.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2014 [2014/08] |
10.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.02.2014 [2014/07] |
23.08.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 25.09.2013 [2013/39] |
20.08.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
20.08.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
05.07.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.05.2013 |
Change: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.05.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
19.03.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
07.01.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.12.2012 |
First examination report |
|
03.07.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.06.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.08.2012 [2012/31] |
23.06.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
01.06.2012 |
Change - representative |
published on 04.07.2012 [2012/27] |
21.12.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 21.12.2011 [2011/51] |