Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8944378 | Global Dossier | 03.02.2015 | B2 | US2011309195 | 22.12.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10006353 | 18.06.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2397409 | Global Dossier | 25.09.2013 | B1 | EP2397409 | 21.12.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10006353 | 18.06.2010 |