EP2355412 - Method and device for evaluating an electric assembly of an electric energy system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.06.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2015 | Refusal of application | published on 15.07.2015 [2015/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Omicron electronics GmbH Oberes Ried 1 6833 Klaus / AT | [2011/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steinhauser, Fred, Dr. Anna-Hensler-Strasse 32e 6833 Klaus / AT | 02 /
Marinescu, Cristian, Dr. Moosmahdstrasse 20 6850 Dornbirn / AT | [2011/32] | Representative(s) | Banzer, Hans-Jörg Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/32] | Banzer, Hans-Jörg Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10006494.8 | 22.06.2010 | [2011/32] | Priority number, date | EP20100001233 | 05.02.2010 Original published format: EP 10001233 | [2011/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2355412 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/26, G01F19/00 | [2011/32] | CPC: |
H04L43/08 (EP,US);
H04L43/106 (EP,US);
Y04S40/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Bewerten einer elektrischen Anlage eines elektrischen Energiesystems | [2011/32] | English: | Method and device for evaluating an electric assembly of an electric energy system | [2011/32] | French: | Procédé et dispositif d'évaluation d'une installation électrique d'un système d'énergie électrique | [2011/32] | Examination procedure | 10.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/13] | 19.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/29] | 29.01.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/29] | 26.02.2015 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.09.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO02054562 (ABB AB [SE], et al) [Y] 3-15,20-22 * page 5, line 5 - page 23, line 22 * [A] 1,2,16-19; | [XY]EP1931012 (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH]) [X] 1,2,16-19,23 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0006] - [0018] * [Y] 3-15,20-22; | [XY]EP2109204 (ABB TECHNOLOGY AG [CH]) [X] 1-5,16-19,23 * paragraphs [0008] - [0015] - [0023] * [Y] 6-15,20-22; | [E]EP2288080 (ABB TECHNOLOGY AG [CH]) [E] 1,16 * paragraphs [0004] , [0007] , [0010] - [0014] - [0026] , [0027]; claim - *; | [A] - PEICHAO ZHANG ET AL, "Compatibility and interoperability evaluation for all-digital protection system through automatic application test", 2006 IEEE POWER ENGINEERING SOCIETY GENERAL MEETING IEEE PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20060618), ISBN 1-4244-0493-2, page 7 PP., XP002627774 [A] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PES.2006.1709286 | [A] - HONG HEE LEE ET AL, "Real-time communications on IEC 61850 process bus based distributed sampled measured values applications in merging unit", ADVANCED INTELLIGENT COMPUTING THEORIES AND APPLICATIONS. WITH ASPECTS OF THEORETICAL AND METHODOLOGICAL ISSUES. 4TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INTELLIGENT COMPUTING, ICIC 2008 SPRINGER-VERLAG BERLIN, GERMANY, (20080915), ISBN 978-3-540-87440-9, pages 1250 - 1257, XP002627775 [A] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-540-87442-3_154 | Examination | US6853619 | - HONG JAMES W, "TU18: Interne Traffic Monitoring and Analysis: Methods and Applications", GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE WORKSHOPS, 2004. GLOBECOM WORKSHO PS 2004. IEEE DALLAS, TX, USA 29 NOV. - 3 DEC., 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20041129), ISBN 978-0-7803-8798-0, pages 1 - 63, XP002609903 |