EP2237306 - Material characterization system using an electron beam [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.2013 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.05.2013 [2013/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi High-Technologies Corporation 24-14, Nishishinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8717 / JP | For all designated states Hitachi Science Systems, Ltd. 1040, Ichige, Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-0033 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/40] | For all designated states Hitachi High-Technologies Corporation 24-14, Nishishinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8717 / JP | ||
For all designated states Hitachi Science Systems, Ltd. 1040, Ichige, Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-0033 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yaguchi, Toshie c/o Hitachi Science Systems, Ltd. 1040, Ichige Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-0033 / JP | 02 /
Kamino, Takeo c/o Hitachi High-Technologies Corporation 24-14, Nishi-Shimbasi 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8717 / JP | 03 /
Taniguchi, Yoshifumi c/o Hitachi High-Technologies Corporation Naka Division, Design & Manufacturing Group 882, Ichige Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki / JP | [2012/21] |
Former [2010/51] | 01 /
Yaguchi, Toshie c/o Hitachi Science Systems, Ltd. 1040, Ichige Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-0033 / JP | ||
02 /
Kamino, Takeo c/o Hitachi High-Technologies Corporation 24-14, Nishi-Shimbasi 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8717 / JP | |||
03 /
Taniguchi, Yoshifumi c/o Hitachi High-Technologies Corporation Naka Division, Design & Manufacturing Group 882, Ichige Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki / JP | |||
Former [2010/40] | 01 /
Yaguchi, Toshie c/o Hitachi Science Systems, Ltd. 1040, Ichige Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-0033 / JP | ||
02 /
Kamino, Takeo c/o Hitachi Science Systems, Ltd. 1040, Ichige Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-0033 / JP | |||
03 /
Taniguchi, Yoshifumi c/o Hitachi High-Technologies Corporation Naka Division, Design & Manufacturing Group 882, Ichige Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki / JP | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2012/21] |
Former [2010/40] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10006800.6 | 18.03.2004 | [2010/40] | Priority number, date | JP20030073932 | 18.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003073932 | [2010/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2237306 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2237306 | Date: | 23.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/252, G01N23/225, H01J37/244, H01J37/28 | [2010/40] | CPC: |
G01N23/2252 (EP,US);
G01N23/20 (EP,US);
H01J37/244 (EP,US);
H01J37/256 (EP,US);
H01J37/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2010/40] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Materialuntersuchung mittels Elektronenstrahl | [2010/40] | English: | Material characterization system using an electron beam | [2010/40] | French: | Dispositif pour l'analyse de matériaux utilisant des rayons d'électrons | [2010/40] | Examination procedure | 28.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/50] | 06.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04006576.5 / EP1463088 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040006576) is 07.08.2007 | Opposition(s) | 26.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS59163550 (DENRIYOKU CHUO KENKYUSHO, et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * figures 1-3,5,8 *; | [A]EP0584923 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | [A] - WATT I M, "The analytical electron microscope", JOURNAL OF PHYSICS E (SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS) UK, (198609), vol. 19, no. 9, ISSN 0022-3735, pages 668 - 678, XP002406266 [A] 1-9 * figures 1,2,4,5 * * page 668, paragraph 1.1. - page 669, paragraph 1.2.1. * * page 669 - page 670, paragraph 1.2.3. * * page 670, paragraph 2.1.1. - page 671, paragraph 2.1.3. * * page 672, paragraph 3.1.1. * * page 673, paragraph 4.1. - page 676, paragraph 4.2. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0022-3735/19/9/002 | [A] - YASUNO M ET AL, "DEVELOPMENT OF COINCIDENCE TRANSMISSION ELECTRON MICROSCOPE (II) OBSERVATION OF COINCIDENCE ELECTRON MICROSCOPIC IMAGE", JOURNAL OF ELECTRON MICROSCOPY, JAPANESE SOCIETY FOR ELECTRON MICROSCOPY. TOKYO, JP, (19970101), vol. 46, no. 1, ISSN 0022-0744, pages 79 - 83, XP000699902 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | [A] - REIMER L ET AL, "Combination of EELS modes and electron spectroscopic imaging and diffraction in an energy-filtering electron microscope", ULTRAMICROSCOPY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL LNKD- DOI:10.1016/0304-3991(92)90023-D, vol. 46, no. 1-4, ISSN 0304-3991, (19921001), pages 335 - 347, (19921001), XP025826790 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0304-3991(92)90023-D | by applicant | JPH0411822 |