EP2404590 - Light hardening ceramic dross for stereolithographic production of highly stable ceramics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ivoclar Vivadent AG Bendererstrasse 2 9494 Schaan / LI | [2012/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fischer, Urs Karl Berglistrasse 23 9320 Arbon / CH | 02 /
Moszner, Norbert Meierhofstr. 39 9495 Triesen / LI | 03 /
Rheinberger, Volker Mareestrasse 34 9490 Vaduz / LI | 04 /
Wachter, Wolfgang In der Fina 10 9494 Schaan / LI | 05 /
Homa, Johannes Gutzkowplatz 8/16/7 1130 Wien / AT | 06 /
Längle, Werner Hofnerfeldweg 38 6820 Frastanz / AT | [2019/24] |
Former [2012/02] | 01 /
Fischer, Urs Karl Berglistrasse 23 9320 Arbon / CH | ||
02 /
Moszner, Norbert, Prof. Dr. Im Bannriet 58 9493 Mauren / LI | |||
03 /
Rheinberger, Volker, Dr. Mareestrasse 34 9490 Vaduz / LI | |||
04 /
Wachter, Wolfgang In der Fina 10 9494 Schaan / LI | |||
05 /
Homa, Johannes, Dr. Churer Tor 8/1 6800 Feldkirch / AT | |||
06 /
Längle, Werner Hofnerfeldweg 38 6820 Frastanz / AT | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [2019/24] |
Former [2012/02] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 10007066.3 | 08.07.2010 | [2012/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2404590 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2404590 | Date: | 12.06.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K6/083, C04B35/634 | [2012/02] | CPC: |
C04B35/111 (EP,US);
C04B35/64 (US);
A61K6/807 (EP,US);
A61K6/818 (EP,US);
A61K6/822 (EP,US);
A61K6/833 (EP,US);
A61K6/887 (EP,US);
C04B35/486 (EP,US);
C04B35/4885 (EP,US);
C04B35/6263 (EP,US);
C04B35/6264 (EP,US);
C04B35/6325 (EP,US);
C04B35/63424 (EP,US);
C04B35/6346 (EP,US);
C04B35/63488 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3206 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3208 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3225 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3229 (EP,US);
C04B2235/44 (EP,US);
C04B2235/449 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K6/887, C08L33/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/24] |
Former [2012/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Lichthärtende Keramikschlicker für die stereolithographische Herstellung von hochfesten Keramiken | [2012/02] | English: | Light hardening ceramic dross for stereolithographic production of highly stable ceramics | [2012/02] | French: | Barbotine en céramique durcissant à la lumière pour la fabrication stéréo-lithographique de céramiques à haute résistance | [2012/02] | Examination procedure | 13.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/22] | 22.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.07.2010 | AL | 12.06.2019 | CY | 12.06.2019 | CZ | 12.06.2019 | DK | 12.06.2019 | EE | 12.06.2019 | FI | 12.06.2019 | HR | 12.06.2019 | IT | 12.06.2019 | LT | 12.06.2019 | LV | 12.06.2019 | MC | 12.06.2019 | MK | 12.06.2019 | MT | 12.06.2019 | NL | 12.06.2019 | PL | 12.06.2019 | RO | 12.06.2019 | SE | 12.06.2019 | SI | 12.06.2019 | SK | 12.06.2019 | SM | 12.06.2019 | TR | 12.06.2019 | IE | 08.07.2019 | LU | 08.07.2019 | BE | 31.07.2019 | BG | 12.09.2019 | NO | 12.09.2019 | GR | 13.09.2019 | PT | 14.10.2019 | IS | 12.11.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 08.07.2010 | |
AL | 12.06.2019 | ||
CY | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
MT | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IE | 08.07.2019 | ||
LU | 08.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
IS | 12.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 08.07.2010 | |
AL | 12.06.2019 | ||
CY | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IE | 08.07.2019 | ||
LU | 08.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
IS | 12.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
CY | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IE | 08.07.2019 | ||
LU | 08.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
IS | 12.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IE | 08.07.2019 | ||
LU | 08.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
IS | 12.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LU | 08.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 12.06.2019 | |
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 12.06.2019 | |
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9903444 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1* page 16, line 20 - line 22; example 22; claim 9 *; | [X]US2008206715 (KAWAMOTO ANDY T [US], et al) [X] 1,2,13 * paragraphs [0040] , [0 44] , [0 49]; examples 2, 5, 6 *; | [X]EP2077103 (KERR CORP [US]) [X] 1 * example 12; claims 1, 4, 12 *; | [X]EP2151214 (IVOCLAR VIVADENT AG [LI], et al) [X] 1,2,4-12,14-16 * paragraphs [0032] , [0 33] , [0 76]; claims 1-10, 13-15 * | by applicant | WO9528688 | US5496682 | WO9729901 | EP1021997 | US6117612 | DE19938463 | DE19950284 | DE10114290 | US2005090575 | DE102005058116 | - A. GEBHARDT, VISION OF RAPID PROTOTYPING, (2006), vol. 83, pages 7 - 12 | - R. MORENO, AMER. CER. SOC. BULL., (1992), vol. 71, pages 1647 - 1657 | - T. OTSU; M. YOSHIDA, MAKROMOL. CHEM., RAPID. COMMUN., (1982), vol. 3, pages 127 - 132 |