EP2236580 - Nitride and oxy-nitride cerium based phosphor materials for solid-state lighting applications [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.2013 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/40] | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Le Toquin, Ronan P. 6514 Rossford Lane Durham, NC 27713 / US | 02 /
Cheetham, Anthony K. 1695 East Valley Raod Santa Barbara, CA 93108 / US | [2010/40] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Martin Peter J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/40] | Jackson, Martin Peter J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10007184.4 | 02.10.2006 | [2010/40] | Priority number, date | US20050722682P | 30.09.2005 Original published format: US 722682 P | US20050722900P | 30.09.2005 Original published format: US 722900 P | [2010/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2236580 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2236580 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | [2010/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C09K11/64, C09K11/59 | [2010/40] | CPC: |
C09K11/0883 (EP,US);
C09K11/77217 (EP,KR,US);
C09K11/77 (KR);
C09K11/77218 (EP,KR,US);
H01L33/502 (EP,US);
H05B33/14 (EP,US);
Y02B20/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/40] | Title | German: | Auf Nitrid und Oxynitrid cer basierende Leuchtstoffmaterialien für Halbleiter-Beleuchtungsanwendungen | [2010/42] | English: | Nitride and oxy-nitride cerium based phosphor materials for solid-state lighting applications | [2010/40] | French: | Materiaux phosphorescents a base de cerium nitrure et oxynitrure pour applications d'eclairage a semi-conducteurs | [2010/42] |
Former [2010/40] | Phosphormaterialien auf Basis von Nitrid- und Oxynitrid-Cerium für Festkörperbeleuchtungsanwendungen | ||
Former [2010/40] | Matériaux au phosphore à base de cérium de nitrure et d'oxynitrure pour applications d'éclairage à l'état solide | Examination procedure | 03.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/24] | 04.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/07] | 28.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/07] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06825281.6 / EP1929501 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060825281) is 29.10.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003052595 (ELLENS ANDRIES [NL], et al) [X] 1,2 * claims 1-13 *; | [XP]EP1616930 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [XP] 3-5,7,8,10-14 * table 1 *; | [X] - LAKSHMINARASIMHAN N ET AL, "White-light generation in Sr2SiO4:Eu<2+>, Ce<3+> under near-UV excitation", JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY ELECTROCHEM. SOC USA, (20050728), vol. 152, no. 9, doi:10.1149/1.1997169, ISSN 0013-4651, pages H152 - H156, XP002601645 [X] 3-5,7,10-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1149/1.1997169 | [X] - LI Y Q ET AL, "Luminescence of a new class of UV-blue-emitting phosphors MSi2O2-[delta]N2+2/3[delta]:Ce<3+> (M = Ca, Sr, Ba)", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS CHEMISTRY R. SOC. CHEM UK, (20050907), vol. 15, no. 42, doi:10.1039/b507735d, ISSN 0959-9428, pages 4492 - 4496, XP002601646 [X] 3-6,10-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/B507735D | [X] - KELSEY P V JR ET AL, "Ce<3+>-activated photoluminescence in the BaO-SrO-SiO2 system. I. Crystalline phases", JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY USA, (19760930), vol. 123, no. 9, ISSN 0013-4651, pages 1384 - 1388, XP002601647 [X] 3-5,7,8,10-14 * the whole document * | Examination | - LAKSHMINARASIMHAN N ET AL, "White-light generation in Sr2SiO4:Eu<2+>, Ce<3+> under near-UV excitation", INSPEC, THE INSTITUTION OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STEVENAGE, GB, (200509), Database accession no. 8756174 | - JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY ELECTROCHEM. SOC USA, vol. 152, no. 9, doi:10.1149/1.1997169, ISSN 0013-4651, pages H152 - H156 | by applicant | US5998925 | US2003006702 | US6670748 | US6682663 | US6717353 | - G. BLASSE; A. BRILL, APPL. PHYS. LETT., (1967), page 11 | - J. CHEM. PHYS., (1967), vol. 47, page 5139 | - T. JUSTEL; H. NIKOL; C. RONDA, ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED., (1998), vol. 37, pages 3084 - 3103 | - J. W. H. VAN KREVEL; H. T. HINTZEN; R. METSELAAR; A. MEIJERINK, J. ALLOYS COMPD., (1998), vol. 268, no. 1-2, pages 272 - 277 | - J. W. H. VAN KREVEL; J. W. T. VAN RUTTEN; H. MANDAL; H. T. HINZEN; R. METSELAAR, J. SOLID STATE CHEM., (2002), vol. 165, no. 1, pages 19 - 24 | - Z. K. HUANG; W. Y. SUN; D. S. YAN, JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE LETTERS, (1985), vol. 4, pages 255 - 259 |