Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
17.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] |
02.12.2014 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
30.08.2014 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
07.03.2014 | Publication of search report | published on 09.04.2014 [2014/15] |
07.03.2014 | Change - classification | published on 09.04.2014 [2014/15] |
12.07.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
26.04.2013 | Change - applicant | published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] |
26.04.2013 | Change - representative | published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] |
17.07.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
21.01.2011 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 23.02.2011 [2011/08] |