EP2287363 - Electrode and electrode coating [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.04.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10 40789 Monheim / DE | [2013/22] |
Former [2011/08] | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bulan, Andreas Alt Langenfeld 15 40764 Langenfeld / DE | 02 /
Schmitz, Norbert Ordersteimel 21 51766 Engelskirchen / DE | [2011/08] | Representative(s) | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/22] | BIP Patents Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 10007416.0 | 17.07.2010 | [2011/08] | Priority number, date | DE20091035546 | 31.07.2009 Original published format: DE102009035546 | [2011/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2287363 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2287363 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C25B11/04 | [2011/08] | CPC: |
C25B1/46 (EP,US);
C25B11/093 (EP,US);
B01J23/462 (US);
C25B11/091 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Elektrode und Elektrodenbeschichtung | [2011/08] | English: | Electrode and electrode coating | [2011/08] | French: | Electrode et revêtement d'électrode | [2011/08] | Examination procedure | 10.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/21] | 01.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4210501 (COKER THOMAS G [US], et al) [X] 1,5-9,14 * column 1, line 15 - line 22 * * column 2, line 39 - column 6, line 9 * * figure 2 * [I] 2,3,15; | [XYI]US2007212594 (TAKASU YOSHIO [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,5,7,9,14 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0116] * * paragraph [0128] - paragraph [0156] * [Y] 10-12 [I] 2; | [X]US2006147788 (LEE SEOL-AH [KR], et al) [X] 1,5,7 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0058] *; | [X]JPH07216570 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS) [X] 1,5-7,14 * paragraph [0011]; examples 1-4 *; | [X]US2009068546 (SATO YOSHINORI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0066] * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2004067409 (TANAKA KOICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,5,7 * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0052] * * figures 1, 4 *; | [X]US4524114 (SAMUELS GEORGE J [US], et al) [X] 1,5,7 * figure 1 * * column 1, line 60 - line 63 * * column 3, line 34 - line 63 *; | [Y]EP1489200 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL]) [Y] 10-12 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2006002843 | DE602005002661T | - ELECTROCHIMICA ACTA, (1989), vol. 34, no. 6, pages 811 - 822 | - PHILOSOPHICAL MAGAZINE, (20041011), vol. 84, no. 29, pages 3159 - 3167 | - "Nitrogencontaining carbon nanotubes", J. MATER. CHEM., (1997), vol. 7, no. 12, pages 2335 - 2337 |