EP2413053 - Control unit for a device such as a fan [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deccan Power Products Pvt. Ltd. A3-4/A Electronic Complex Kushaiguda ECIL Post Hyderabad 500 062 / IN | [2012/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reedy, Mulumudi Venkata Seetha Rami 304, Manjeera Homes, Road No. 6 West Marredpally Secunderabad-500026 Bangalore-560054 / IN | 02 /
Raj, Antony Anand 26, Sthothra, 5th Corss, AG Layout New BEL Road, (MSRIT Post ) Bangalore-560054 / IN | [2013/18] |
Former [2012/05] | 01 /
Reedy, Mulumudi Venkata Seetha Rami 304, Manjeera Homes, Road No. 6 West Marredpally Secunderabad-500026 Bangalore-560054 / IN | ||
02 /
Raj, Antony Anand 26, Sthothra, 5th Cross, AG Layout MSRIT Post, New BEL Road Bangalore-560054 / IN | Representative(s) | Rentsch Partner AG Kirchenweg 8 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/19] | Rentsch Partner AG Rechtsanwälte und Patentanwälte Fraumünsterstrasse 9 Postfach 2441 8022 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2012/16] | Rentsch Partner AG Assoc. No. 254 Fraumünsterstrasse 9 Postfach 9 P.O. Box 2441 8022 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2012/05] | Rentsch Partner AG Rechtsanwälte und Patentanwälte Fraumünsterstrasse 9 Postfach 2441 8022 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 10007721.3 | 26.07.2010 | [2012/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2413053 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2413053 | Date: | 08.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F24F11/00, H05B37/02, G05B19/10, F24F7/007, F04D25/08, F04D27/00 | [2012/48] | CPC: |
G05B19/10 (EP);
F24F11/77 (EP,US);
F04D25/088 (EP);
F04D27/004 (EP);
F24F11/52 (EP,US);
F24F11/56 (EP,US);
F24F7/007 (EP);
F24F11/30 (EP);
F24F2120/10 (EP);
Y02B30/70 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/05] | F24F11/00, H05B37/02, G05B19/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/05] | Title | German: | Steuereinheit für eine Vorrichtung, wie ein Gebläse | [2012/05] | English: | Control unit for a device such as a fan | [2012/05] | French: | Unité de contrôle pour dispositif tel qu'un ventilateur | [2012/05] | Examination procedure | 31.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/37] | 19.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.07.2010 | AL | 08.05.2013 | AT | 08.05.2013 | BE | 08.05.2013 | CY | 08.05.2013 | CZ | 08.05.2013 | DK | 08.05.2013 | EE | 08.05.2013 | FI | 08.05.2013 | HR | 08.05.2013 | IT | 08.05.2013 | LT | 08.05.2013 | LV | 08.05.2013 | MC | 08.05.2013 | MK | 08.05.2013 | MT | 08.05.2013 | NL | 08.05.2013 | PL | 08.05.2013 | RO | 08.05.2013 | SE | 08.05.2013 | SI | 08.05.2013 | SK | 08.05.2013 | SM | 08.05.2013 | TR | 08.05.2013 | LU | 26.07.2013 | FR | 31.07.2013 | BG | 08.08.2013 | NO | 08.08.2013 | GR | 09.08.2013 | ES | 19.08.2013 | IS | 08.09.2013 | PT | 09.09.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 26.07.2010 | |
AT | 08.05.2013 | ||
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
IT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
MC | 08.05.2013 | ||
MK | 08.05.2013 | ||
MT | 08.05.2013 | ||
NL | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
SM | 08.05.2013 | ||
TR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LU | 26.07.2013 | ||
FR | 31.07.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
IT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
MC | 08.05.2013 | ||
MK | 08.05.2013 | ||
MT | 08.05.2013 | ||
NL | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
SM | 08.05.2013 | ||
TR | 08.05.2013 | ||
FR | 31.07.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
IT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
MC | 08.05.2013 | ||
NL | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
SM | 08.05.2013 | ||
FR | 31.07.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
IT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
MC | 08.05.2013 | ||
NL | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
FR | 31.07.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
IT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
MC | 08.05.2013 | ||
NL | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
IT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/06] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 08.05.2013 | |
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4515538 (SHIH HUNG Y [TW]) [A] 3 * abstract *; | [XI]US5189412 (MEHTA VINAY [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9-13 * column 1, lines 10-25; figures 2-6 * * column 7, line 50 - column 10, line 64 * * abstract * [I] 3-8; | [A]US2005162397 (KWON BOM-JUN [KR], et al) [A] 3,4* paragraphs [0016] - [0021] - [0041] , [0048]; figure 1D * |