Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2308492 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2308492



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






All documents(66)
Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 426
19.07.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
14.09.2016 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
19.08.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
02.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.08.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
02.08.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 1
02.08.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 1
02.08.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
13.04.2016 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
07.04.2016 Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
07.04.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
07.04.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
07.04.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
07.04.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 40
07.04.2016 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 40
01.04.2016 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 2
24.03.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
24.03.2016 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
24.03.2016 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
15.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
15.03.2016 Claims Search / examination 4
15.03.2016 Claims Search / examination 4
15.03.2016 Description Search / examination 20
15.03.2016 Description Search / examination 23
15.03.2016 Description Search / examination 23
15.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.03.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 3
09.03.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
09.03.2016 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
04.03.2016 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
16.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.02.2016 Claims Search / examination 4
16.02.2016 Claims Search / examination 4
16.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.02.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 11
13.11.2015 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
11.11.2015 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
10.11.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
10.11.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
03.11.2015 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
26.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.05.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
26.05.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
26.03.2015 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
16.03.2015 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.11.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
13.11.2014 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
03.03.2014 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
13.10.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.10.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
13.10.2011 Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO Search / examination 5
18.04.2011 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
16.03.2011 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
27.01.2011 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
27.01.2011 European search opinion Search / examination 4
27.01.2011 European search report Search / examination 6
04.08.2010 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
27.07.2010 Abstract Search / examination 1
27.07.2010 Claims Search / examination 3
27.07.2010 Description Search / examination 42
27.07.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
27.07.2010 Drawings Search / examination 1
27.07.2010 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 7
27.07.2010 Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) Search / examination 8
09.08.2006 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 55
09.08.2006 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 49